Ramos v. Delta Air Lines Inc
Plaintiff: Jeannette Ramos
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc and Delta Air Lines Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00010
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/17/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Delta Air Lines Inc.(Pitsch, Samantha)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Delta Air Lines Inc (Pitsch, Samantha)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
January 6, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc (Jorgensen, Caryn)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Samantha Pitsch re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc (Jorgensen, Caryn)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superio, case number 19-2-31866-0-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-6071364), filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Jorgensen, Caryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Delta Air Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc
Represented By: Samantha K Pitsch
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines Inc
Represented By: Samantha K Pitsch
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Ramos
Represented By: Catherine Jura Fleming
Represented By: James Nathan Bingham
Represented By: James T Anderson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?