Kim v. US Bancorp et al
Plaintiff: Steve Kim
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bancorp, US Bancorp and US Bank National Association
Case Number: 2:2020cv00032
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join of Opt-In No. 7 ; filed by Plaintiff Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join)(Marshall, Toby)
February 25, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join of Opt-In No. 6 ; filed by Plaintiff Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join)(Marshall, Toby)
February 19, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join of Opt-In No. 5 ; filed by Plaintiff Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join)(Marshall, Toby)
February 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join of Opt-In No. 4 ; filed by Plaintiff Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Join)(Marshall, Toby)
February 3, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join ; filed by Plaintiff Steve Kim. (Marshall, Toby)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Justin M Swartz for Plaintiff Steve Kim, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael N Litrownik for Plaintiff Steve Kim, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sabine Jean for Plaintiff Steve Kim, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Justin M. Swartz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Steve Kim (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6095526 (Marshall, Toby)
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael N. Litrownik FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Steve Kim (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6095518 (Marshall, Toby)
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sabine Jean FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Steve Kim (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6095507 (Marshall, Toby)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Paolo C Meireles for Steve Kim, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Logan A Pardell for Steve Kim, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gregg I Shavitz for Steve Kim, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Paolo C. Meireles FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Steve Kim (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6087507 (Marshall, Toby)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Logan A. Pardell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Steve Kim (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6087500 (Marshall, Toby)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Gregg I. Shavitz FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Steve Kim (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6087496 (Marshall, Toby)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join ; filed by Plaintiff Steve Kim. (Marshall, Toby)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants US Bancorp and US Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT)
January 9, 2020 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class and Collective Action Complaint against defendant(s) U.S. Bancorp, U.S. Bank National Association with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6077608) Attorney Toby James Marshall added to party Steve Kim(pty:pla), filed by Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Marshall, Toby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v. US Bancorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Kim
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Brittany J Glass
Represented By: Paolo C Meireles
Represented By: Gregg I Shavitz
Represented By: Sabine Jean
Represented By: Logan A Pardell
Represented By: Justin M Swartz
Represented By: Michael N Litrownik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?