Kaplan et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Allen Kaplan and Cheryl Kaplan
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00035
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in Northern District of California as case 3:20-cv-1365 on 2/24/2020. (MW)
February 20, 2020 Filing 6 MDL 2741 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-188); In re Roundup Liability Litigation; Northern District of California; assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. (PM)
February 20, 2020 Case sent to the Northern District of California by electronic case transfer. (PM)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Monsanto Company mailed on 1/8/2020 (Weymuller, Sims)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/30/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/30/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
January 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Elizabeth Jean McLafferty on behalf of Plaintiffs Allen Kaplan, Cheryl Kaplan. (McLafferty, Elizabeth)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
January 9, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (GT)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against defendant(s) Monsanto Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6078030) Attorney Sims G Weymuller added to party Allen Kaplan(pty:pla), Attorney Sims G Weymuller added to party Cheryl Kaplan(pty:pla), filed by Allen Kaplan, Cheryl Kaplan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weymuller, Sims)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaplan et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Kaplan
Represented By: Sims G Weymuller
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Kaplan
Represented By: Sims G Weymuller
Represented By: Elizabeth Jean McLafferty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?