Maier v. Kane et al
Plaintiff: Michael-John Frederick Maier
Defendant: Jamie Kane and Alta Langdom
Case Number: 2:2020cv00070
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Referring Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson re #1 Application. Objections to R&R due by 3/24/2020. (cc: plaintiff via USPS) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Order of Dismissal, #2 PROPOSED Judgment)(ST)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 2/18/2020 to correct (SG)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Michael-John Frederick Maier. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maier v. Kane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael-John Frederick Maier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Langdom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?