Stanikzy v. Progressive Direct Auto Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ameenjohn Stanikzy
Defendant: Progressive Direct Auto Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00118
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Michael Johnson filed by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company re #20 MOTION to Compel Appraisal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Christie, Robert)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Appraisal, filed by Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel and Stay) Noting Date 4/10/2020, (Christie, Robert)
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Direct Holdings Inc for Progressive Direct Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Christie, Robert)
March 20, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Progressive Direct Insurance Company.(Christie, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Scott P Nealey for Plaintiff Ameenjohn Stanikzy, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Scott P. Nealey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Ameenjohn Stanikzy (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6207626 (Hansen, Stephen)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Zachary A McEntyre for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jeffrey S Cashdan for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James Matthew Brigman for Progressive Direct Insurance Company, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Zachary McEntyre FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6175100 (Christie, Robert)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jeffrey Cashdan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6175084 (Christie, Robert)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew Brigman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6175036 (Christie, Robert)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Leslie Christie on behalf of Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Christie, Robert)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Leslie Christie on behalf of Defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company. (Christie, Robert)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/20/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/27/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Progressive Direct Insurance Company on 2/3/2020, filed by Plaintiff Ameenjohn Stanikzy. (Hansen, Stephen)
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Progressive Direct Insurance Company (TH)
February 3, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Progressive Direct Auto Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND, filed by Ameenjohn Stanikzy. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons)(Hansen, Stephen)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Progressive Direct Auto Insurance Company. (GT)
January 27, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6098741) Attorney Stephen M Hansen added to party Ameenjohn Stanikzy(pty:pla), filed by Ameenjohn Stanikzy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hansen, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanikzy v. Progressive Direct Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameenjohn Stanikzy
Represented By: Stephen M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Direct Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?