Blue-Briggans v. Washington State Liquor & Cannabis Board et al
Plaintiff: Mordecia Blue-Briggans
Defendant: Sharon Hendricks, Does 1-20, Washington State Liquor and Cannabis Board, Nicola M Reid and Washington State Liquor & Cannabis Board
Case Number: 2:2020cv00182
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/13/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/27/2020. (AQ)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Case remains assigned to Hon. Brian A. Tsuchida. (AQ)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kaylynn What on behalf of Defendants Sharon Hendricks, Nicola M Reid, Washington State Liquor & Cannabis Board. (What, Kaylynn)
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 2/13/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
February 6, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS AND CERTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants Sharon Hendricks, Nicola M Reid, Washington State Liquor and Cannabis Board (Attachments: #1 Exhibit King County Superior Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Order Setting Case Schedule - Civil, #3 Exhibit Case Information Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Affidavit/Declaration/Certificate of Service, #6 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #7 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #8 Exhibit Notice, #9 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party of Filing Notice of Removal)(Barbara, Scott)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-26358-0-SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6126598) Attorney Scott M Barbara added to party Sharon Hendricks(pty:dft), Attorney Scott M Barbara added to party Nicola M Reid(pty:dft), Attorney Scott M Barbara added to party Washington State Liquor and Cannabis Board(pty:dft), filed by Nicola M Reid, Sharon Hendricks, Washington State Liquor and Cannabis Board. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Barbara, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue-Briggans v. Washington State Liquor & Cannabis Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mordecia Blue-Briggans
Represented By: Jason E Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Hendricks
Represented By: Scott M Barbara
Represented By: Kaylynn What
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Liquor and Cannabis Board
Represented By: Scott M Barbara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicola M Reid
Represented By: Scott M Barbara
Represented By: Kaylynn What
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Liquor & Cannabis Board
Represented By: Scott M Barbara
Represented By: Kaylynn What
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?