Miller v. Boe
Petitioner: JD Miller
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Case Number: 2:2020cv00245
Filed: February 16, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in the Eastern District of Washington as case 2:20-cv-00112 on 3/20/2020. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(PM)
March 20, 2020 Case sent to District of Eastern District of Washington by electronic case transfer. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(MW)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of Transfer. It is hereby ORDERED that this matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933) (TH)
March 5, 2020 Case will be sent to the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Washington by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(TH)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Docket Report per #4 Letter.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(ST)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER re #3 Petition filed by JD Miller. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(ST)
March 2, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re #4 Letter RE: NON-COMPLIANCE WITH PRISONER E-FILING INITIATIVE. The Western District of Washington received documents from you for filing through the U.S. Postal Service. Pursuant to General Order 06-16, participation in the Prisoner E-Filing Initiative is mandatory for all prisoner litigants incarcerated at the Clallam Bay Corrections Center. These documents will be filed by the clerk in this instance, it is not necessary to refile. Please comply by submitting all future documents to be filed with this Court to the Law Librarian/designee for electronic filing. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(ST)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JD Miller. (Receipt # TAC016082) **15 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(ST)
February 28, 2020 IFP deficiency corrected **DO NOT PRINT**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(ST)
February 28, 2020 Filing fee received: $ 5.00, receipt number TAC016082 **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(ST)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $5.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- An IFP form is enclosed for your convenience. Filer has until 3/19/2020 to correct (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(ST)
February 16, 2020 Filing 1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Petitioner JD Miller. (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP) **15 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(JD Miller, Prisoner ID: 367933)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeri Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JD Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?