Harris v. General Motors LLC
Plaintiff: Kelly Harris
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00257
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' #10 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time: The deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to Thursday, 6/25/2020; and The deadline for the parties to exchange initial disclosures and file a Joint Status Report is EXTENDED to Friday, 7/3/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(MW)
April 2, 2020 Filing 10 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff Kelly Harris. Noting Date 4/2/2020, (Stephens, Kim)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Wilson Daniel Miles, III for Plaintiff Kelly Harris, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James Mitchell Williams for Plaintiff Kelly Harris, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney H. Clay Barnett, III for Plaintiff Kelly Harris, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY J. Mitch Williams FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Kelly Harris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6170500 (Stephens, Kim)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY H. Clay Barnett, III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Kelly Harris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6170490 (Stephens, Kim)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY W. Daniel Miles, III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Kelly Harris (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6170468 (Stephens, Kim)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/10/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/24/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant General Motors LLC (CDA)
February 20, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (CDA)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (CLASS ACTION) against defendant(s) General Motors LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6159396), filed by Kelly Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stephens, Kim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Harris
Represented By: Kaleigh N.B. Powell
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Represented By: H. Clay Barnett, III
Represented By: James Mitchell Williams
Represented By: Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?