Sanh v. Opportunity Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sopheary Sanh
Defendant: Rise Credit Service of Texas, LLC, Opportunity Financial, LLC, Applied Data Finance, LLC, Rise Credit Service of Texas LLC, Opportunity Financial LLC and Applied Data Finance LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00310
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand ; by Plaintiff Sopheary Sanh. (Donckers, Brendan)
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #19 MOTION to Remand (Escobar, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Andrew R. Escobar filed by Defendant Opportunity Financial LLC re #19 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Escobar, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 Supplemental DECLARATION of Shiven Shah filed by Defendant Opportunity Financial LLC re #19 MOTION to Remand (Escobar, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Defendant Opportunity Financial LLC, to #19 MOTION to Remand . (Escobar, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 5-7 days. Jury Trial is set for 6/7/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Deadline for Initial Disclosures pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) due by 4/10/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 8/28/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/9/2020, Discovery completed by 2/7/2021, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 2/21/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/9/2021, Motions in Limine due by 5/10/2021, Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/2/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 6/2/2021, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5 - 7. Filed by Plaintiff Sopheary Sanh.(Donckers, Brendan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Sopheary Sanh. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/10/2020, (Donckers, Brendan)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' #15 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file any Motion to Remand, if at all, within fifteen (15) days of entry of the parties' Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order for Extension of Deadlines. Within thirty (30) days of the Court's resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand or confirmation from Plaintiff's counsel that Plaintiff does not intend to seek remand, Defendants shall respond to the Class Action Complaint by Answering and/or Filing a Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs opposition papers, if any, to any Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on the fifth Monday following Defendants' response; and Defendants' reply papers to Plaintiff's oppositions, if any, to any such Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on the second Friday following Plaintiffs opposition papers. Said Friday shall be the noting date for any Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Applied Data Finance LLC (Beane, Amanda)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 4/1/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION and Proposed Order for Extension of Deadlines, filed by Defendant Applied Data Finance LLC. Noting Date 3/4/2020, (Beane, Amanda)
March 3, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate RISE Credit, LLC, Other Affiliate Elevate Credit, Inc. for Rise Credit Service of Texas LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Rise Credit Service of Texas LLC (Pritchard, J.)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Richard L. Scheff for Rise Credit Service of Texas LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 27, 2020 Attorney Virginia A Weeks added for Opportunity Financial LLC; per #12 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
February 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Ian Freeburg on behalf of Defendant Opportunity Financial LLC. (Freeburg, David)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David Foster Herman for Rise Credit Service of Texas LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
February 27, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Applied Data Finance LLC and Rise Credit Service of Texas LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/5/2020. (GT)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GT)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT)
February 27, 2020 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Richard L. Scheff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Rise Credit Service of Texas, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6177762 (Pritchard, J.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David F. Herman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Rise Credit Service of Texas, LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6177756 (Pritchard, J.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to attach document re #5 Notice of Appearance by Defendant Rise Credit Service of Texas, LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Pritchard, J.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J. Scott Pritchard on behalf of Defendant Rise Credit Service of Texas, LLC. (Pritchard, J.)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate David Vennettilli, Other Affiliate Bruce Hammersley, Other Affiliate Ray Chay, Other Affiliate Jessica LaForte, Other Affiliate Inoh Choe, Other Affiliate Jeremiah Kaye, Other Affiliate CJ Newton, Other Affiliate JSK Management Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Todd Schwartz Capital Group LP, Other Affiliate OppFi Management Holdings, LLC for Opportunity Financial, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Opportunity Financial, LLC (Escobar, Andrew)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Defendant Opportunity Financial, LLC. (Escobar, Andrew)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Shiven Shah re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Opportunity Financial, LLC (Escobar, Andrew)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-02268-3; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6175397), filed by Opportunity Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Class Action Complaint, #2 Exhibit A)(Escobar, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanh v. Opportunity Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise Credit Service of Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opportunity Financial, LLC
Represented By: Virginia A Weeks
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Data Finance, LLC
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Represented By: Nitika Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rise Credit Service of Texas LLC
Represented By: J. Scott Pritchard
Represented By: David Foster Herman
Represented By: Richard L. Scheff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opportunity Financial LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ramiro Escobar
Represented By: Virginia A Weeks
Represented By: David Ian Freeburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Data Finance LLC
Represented By: Amanda J Beane
Represented By: Nitika Arora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sopheary Sanh
Represented By: Samuel R Leonard
Represented By: Roger M Townsend
Represented By: Brendan Wesley Donckers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?