D'Haiti v. Philips North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: Derick D'Haiti
Defendant: Philips North America LLC, Philips Healthcare, XYZ Company and ABC Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00358
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *4 days*. Jury Trial is set for 6/7/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 5/22/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/9/2020, Motions due by 1/8/2021, Discovery completed by 2/8/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/9/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 4/23/2021, Motions in Limine due by 5/10/2021, Pretrial Order due by 5/26/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/2/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/2/2021. (LC)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. Filed by Defendant Philips North America LLC.(Scisciani, Anthony)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Defendant Philips North America LLC.(Scisciani, Anthony)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Philips North America LLC (Scisciani, Anthony)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 4/21/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/7/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/14/2020. (LC)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; by Philips North America LLC.(Scisciani, Anthony)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Philips North America LLC (Scisciani, Anthony)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KB)
March 5, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant Philips North America LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 3/12/2020. (KB)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (KB)
March 5, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (KB)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Kelsey Shewbert re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Philips North America LLC d/b/a Philips Healthcare (Scisciani, Anthony)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 20-2-00938-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6192872), filed by Philips North America LLC d/b/a Philips Healthcare. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scisciani, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2020: #3 Complaint) (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Haiti v. Philips North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America LLC
Represented By: Anthony R Scisciani, III
Represented By: Kelsey L. Shewbert
Represented By: Kelsey Lynn Shewbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips Healthcare
Represented By: Anthony R Scisciani, III
Represented By: Kelsey L. Shewbert
Represented By: Kelsey Lynn Shewbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick D'Haiti
Represented By: Donna L Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?