Harris v. Law School Admissions Council
Plaintiff: Russell Dean Harris
Defendant: Law School Admissions Council Inc and Law School Admissions Council
Case Number: 2:2020cv00419
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY, filed by Defendant Law School Admissions Council, TO RESPONSE to #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Roberts, Tyler)
May 6, 2020 The Court, sua sponte, RESETS the following deadlines: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/15/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/29/2020, Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2020. (TF)
May 6, 2020 Filing 30 The Court RENOTES Deft's #12 #21 MOTIONS to Dismiss and Deft's #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: Noting Date 5/22/2020. The Court also NOTES Pltf's #15 OBJECTIONS to Deft's notice of removal: NOTED on motion calendar for 5/22/2020. (TF)
May 6, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Russell Dean Harris, to #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Harris, Russell)
May 6, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Russell Dean Harris, to #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Harris, Russell) Modified on 5/6/2020. Stricken as duplicative to dkt #27 . (TF). Modified on 5/7/2020 to add link to original filing (PM).
April 27, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Russell Dean Harris, to #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Harris, Russell)
April 24, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Caroline Mew filed by Defendant Law School Admissions Council re #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Roberts, Tyler)
April 24, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery , filed by Defendant Law School Admissions Council. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/8/2020, (Roberts, Tyler)
April 23, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's emails to courtroom deputy and Defendant's counsel. This order serves as caution to Plaintiff that future email communication with the courtroom deputy is reserved strictly for administrative matters, such as scheduling hearings. As for Plaintiff's communications with Defendant's counsel, the Court's expectation is that both parties will act with dignity, integrity, and courtesy in all future oral and written communications. Authorized by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (PM)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Judge Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number C20-0419JLR-MLP. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 20, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Caroline Mew filed by Defendant Law School Admissions Council re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Roberts, Tyler)
April 20, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Law School Admissions Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Roberts, Tyler)
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Honorable John C. Coughenour, United States District Judge, hereby RECUSES himself from this case. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C20-419-JLR. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/14/2020, Joint Status Report due by 5/21/2020. (TF)
April 9, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour and referred to Hon. Michelle L. Peterson pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF)
April 9, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Defendant Law School Admissions Council re #15 Objections (Opposition to Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Notice of Removal (Roberts, Tyler)
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Russell Dean Harris.(Harris, Russell)
March 26, 2020 Filing 15 OBJECTIONS To defendants notice of removal by Plaintiff Russell Dean Harris (Harris, Russell)
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE: Plaintiff Russell Dean Harris has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (STP)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Caroline Mew filed by Defendant Law School Admissions Council re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Roberts, Tyler)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Law School Admissions Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/8/2020, (Roberts, Tyler)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 4/14/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF) cc: Pro Se Harris
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Caroline Mew for Defendant Law School Admissions Council, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Caroline M. Mew FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Law School Admissions Council (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6223602 (Roberts, Tyler) Corrected name on 3/23/2020 (DS).
March 20, 2020 Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Law School Admissions Council (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Records)(Roberts, Tyler)
March 19, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
March 19, 2020 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (CDA)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Law School Admissions Council Inc re #2 Declaration (non motion), #3 Notice-Other, #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Roberts, Tyler)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Law School Admissions Council Inc (Roberts, Tyler)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Law School Admissions Council Inc. (Roberts, Tyler)
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Tyler Roberts of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Law School Admissions Council Inc (Roberts, Tyler)
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-02313-2; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6219124), filed by Law School Admissions Council Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Complaint)(Roberts, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Law School Admissions Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law School Admissions Council Inc
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law School Admissions Council
Represented By: Tyler S. Roberts
Represented By: Caroline Mew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Dean Harris
Represented By: Russell Dean Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?