Killam v. Port of Seattle
Plaintiff: Adrianna Killam
Defendant: Port of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2020cv00432
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Parties' 14 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Case Until October 26, 2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Parties' 12 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Case Until August 17, 2020 Pending Settlement Negotiations. Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(LH)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re parties' 10 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Case Until 7/6/2020 Pending Settlement Negotiations. Defendant's deadline to file a responsive pleading is extended to July 6, 2020. Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re parties' 5 Stipulated Motion for Stay of Case Until June 5 Pending Settlement Negotiations. Case stayed until 6/5/2020; Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killam v. Port of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianna Killam
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Michael M Terasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?