de Chavez v. Executive Office for Immigration Review
Plaintiff: Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Case Number: 2:2020cv00455
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. re Plaintiff's #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) (TH)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendant Executive Office for Immigration Review. (Lambert, Michelle)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To facilitate entry of an appropriate scheduling order in this matter, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 and Local Civil Rule 16, counsel are directed to confer and to file a JOINT STATUS REPORT by 7/31/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Executive Office for Immigration Review on 4/1/2020, filed by Plaintiff Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez. (Theriot-Orr, Devin)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Executive Office for Immigration Review (MW)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Executive Office for Immigration Review (Summons(es) as provided by plaintiff to be electronically issued) (Receipt # IFP Granted), filed by Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez.(MW)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(MW)
March 30, 2020 REFERRING #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to: Judge Brian A Tsuchida. (KB)
March 27, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (SG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis , filed by Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Theriot-Orr, Devin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: de Chavez v. Executive Office for Immigration Review
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for Immigration Review
Represented By: Michelle R. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaquelyn Andrade de Chavez
Represented By: Devin T Theriot-Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?