Riley v. The Boeing Company et al
Plaintiff: Marie Riley
Defendant: The Boeing Company, Newco, Inc. d/b/a Cascade Columbia Distribution Company and Newco Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00458
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Alexandra B. Caggiano filed by Plaintiff Marie Riley re #25 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Weinstein, Brian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Marie Riley, TO RESPONSE to #25 MOTION to Remand (Weinstein, Brian)
May 18, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Defendant The Boeing Company, to #25 MOTION to Remand . (Rosencrans, Todd)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for twenty-one (21) days following the Court's order resolving Plaintiff's motion for remand for defendant Newco, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint re parties' #26 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) Modified on 4/30/2020: added additional text re motion for remand (PM).
April 28, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re: Extension of Time for Defendant Newco, Inc. to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by parties (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Erfle, Nancy)
April 27, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Marie Riley. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Weinstein, Brian)
April 14, 2020 Filing 24 REDACTION to #3 Notice-Other, (Redacted Notice to Plaintiff of Removal) by Defendant The Boeing Company (Rosencrans, Todd)
April 14, 2020 Filing 23 REDACTION to #2 Declaration (non motion), (Redacted Declaration of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court Clerk by Defendant The Boeing Company (Rosencrans, Todd)
April 14, 2020 Filing 22 REDACTION to #1 Notice of Removal,, (Redacted Notice of Removal and Exhibits A-C) by Defendant The Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Rosencrans, Todd)
April 13, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice-Other, #2 Declaration (non motion): The Notice of Removal and State Court Complaint(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (KB)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Defendant Newco, Inc.'s #18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. The deadline to file and serve Defendant Newco, Inc. d/b/a Cascade Columbia Distribution Company's responsive pleading is hereby extended until and through April 28, 2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re parties' #12 Stipulation. It is HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline fordefendant The Boeing Company to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to twenty-one (21) days following Plaintiff's counsel's written communication to counsel for Boeing of Plaintiff's decision not to file a motion to remand, or, in the event that Plaintiff files a motion to remand, twenty-one (21) days following the Court's order resolving Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Susan Maura Ulrich for Defendant Marie Riley, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 8, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, filed by Defendant Newco Inc. Noting Date 4/8/2020, (Erfle, Nancy)
April 8, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kelly Frances Huedepohl on behalf of Defendant Newco Inc. (Huedepohl, Kelly)
April 8, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nancy M Erfle on behalf of Defendant Newco Inc. (Erfle, Nancy)
April 3, 2020 Filing 15 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant The Boeing Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Rosencrans, Todd)
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Susan Ulrich FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Marie Riley (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6246921 (Weinstein, Brian)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles Stein Siegel for Plaintiff Marie Riley, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order Extending Time for Boeing to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by parties (Rosencrans, Todd)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles S. Siegel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Marie Riley (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6245207 (Weinstein, Brian)
March 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine E Page on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company. (Page, Katherine)
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Monique R Wirrick on behalf of Defendant The Boeing Company. (Wirrick, Monique)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG) Modified on 3/30/2020 CLERICAL ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD(SG).
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification updated Plaintiff name from Mark Riley to Marie Riley per counsel request. (STP)
March 30, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (SG)
March 30, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Notice to Filer : CLERICAL ERROR. Please disregard "notice to filer". (SG)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-00463, 2:20-cv-00464, 2:20-cv-00467, by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Rosencrans, Todd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Boeing Company (Rosencrans, Todd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant The Boeing Company. (Rosencrans, Todd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant The Boeing Company (Rosencrans, Todd)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-04776-7 SEA; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6236718), filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Jury Demand Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit A-C (Complaint, Amended Cook County Complaint and Cook County FNC Order)(Rosencrans, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. The Boeing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Todd W Rosencrans
Represented By: Katherine E Page
Represented By: Monique R Wirrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newco, Inc. d/b/a Cascade Columbia Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newco Inc
Represented By: Nancy M Erfle
Represented By: Kelly Frances Huedepohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Riley
Represented By: Brian Weinstein
Represented By: Alexandra B Caggiano
Represented By: Susan Maura Ulrich
Represented By: Charles Stein Siegel
Represented By: Phillip Alexander Chu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?