York v. ROIC Washington LLC
Plaintiff: Trisha York
Defendant: ROIC Washington, LLC and ROIC Washington LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00460
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Referring Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Michael M Terasaki for Plaintiff Trisha York. (Terasaki, Michael)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/10/2020, by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (TF)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (TF)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Randolph J. Johnson on behalf of Defendant ROIC Washington LLC. (Johnson, Randolph)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 5/6/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by ROIC Washington LLC.(Terry, Stanley)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Retail Opportunity Investments Partnership, LP for ROIC Washington LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by ROIC Washington LLC (Terry, Stanley)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stanley Jay Terry on behalf of Defendant ROIC Washington LLC. (Terry, Stanley)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendant ROIC Washington LLC. (TF)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Trisha York (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Terasaki, Michael)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) ROIC Washington LLC (SG)
March 30, 2020 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (SG)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against defendant(s) ROIC Washington, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6237161) Attorney Conrad Reynoldson added to party Trisha York(pty:pla), filed by Trisha York. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Reynoldson, Conrad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York v. ROIC Washington LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trisha York
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Michael M Terasaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROIC Washington, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROIC Washington LLC
Represented By: Stanley Jay Terry
Represented By: Randolph J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?