Redding v. Washington State Department of Corrections
Petitioner: Joshua Lee Redding
Respondent: Washington State Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2020cv00477
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #9 MOTION to Amend #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joshua Lee Redding, #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joshua Lee Redding. Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2020, Noting Date 6/5/2020. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Proposed Judgment)**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(GB)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, filed by Petitioner Joshua Lee Redding. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(ST)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Petitioner Joshua Lee Redding. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(ST)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Petitioner Joshua Lee Redding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter from Filer)**16 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(ST)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #5 Petition by Petitioner Joshua Lee Redding **4 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(ST)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joshua Lee Redding Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2020, by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(SG)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joshua Lee Redding. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)**19 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(SG)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(SG)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(ST)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Joshua Lee Redding. (NOTE: Attachment(s) 6 and 7 were received by the court on 3/27/20. Documents included with initial filing by clerk.) (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Memorandum in Support of Petition, #3 Proposed Notice of Hearing, #4 Proposed Notice to Set Hearing, #5 Proposed Order to Show Cause, #6 Prison Trust Account Statement, #7 Letter re Prison Trust Account Statement, #8 Letter re Prison Trust Account State forthcoming, #9 Efiling request form from filer to prison)**30 31 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Joshua Redding, Prisoner ID: 816811)(ST) Modified on 3/30/2020 to correct number of pages received. (ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redding v. Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Lee Redding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?