Killam v. SPBS LLC
Plaintiff: Adrianna Killam
Defendant: SPBS LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00496
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 2-3 days. Jury Trial is set for 3/1/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 6/25/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 9/2/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/2/2020, Discovery completed by 11/1/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 11/15/2020, Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2020, Motions in Limine due by 2/1/2021, Pretrial Order due by 2/17/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/24/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions and trial exhibits due by 2/24/2021 (KERR)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 2. (Fong, Bonnie)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lars E Neste on behalf of Defendant SPBS LLC. (Neste, Lars)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher MacMillan on behalf of Defendant SPBS LLC. (MacMillan, Christopher)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) SPBS LLC (SG)
April 2, 2020 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SG)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) SPBS LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6246176) Attorney Bonnie Nobuko Fong added to party Adrianna Killam(pty:pla), filed by Adrianna Killam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fong, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Killam v. SPBS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianna Killam
Represented By: Bonnie Nobuko Fong
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Bonnie Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPBS LLC
Represented By: Lars E Neste
Represented By: Christopher MacMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?