Lewis v. Petri-Laurelhurst Fmly Ltd et al
Plaintiff: Steven M Lewis and Steve Lewis
Defendant: PETRI-LAURELHURST FMLY LTD and Marlene Spencer
Case Number: 2:2020cv00539
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: David W Christel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Petri-Laurelhurst Fmly Ltd, Marlene Spencer (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GMR)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Steve Lewis (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Fong, Bonnie)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #7 Praecipe for a Summons - Summons not provided for Issuance. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (GMR)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Steve Lewis (Fong, Bonnie)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Petri-Laurelhurst Fmly Ltd, Marlene Spencer Steve Lewis with JURY DEMAND, filed by Steve Lewis.(Fong, Bonnie) Modified on 5/15/2020 (GMR).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND re #4 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Steve Lewis by Judge David W. Christel. (KEB)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Steve Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Fong, Bonnie)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Service - Cannon Rogers by Plaintiff Steve Lewis (Fong, Bonnie)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Petri-Laurelhurst Fmly Ltd (CDA)
April 9, 2020 Judge David W. Christel added. (CDA)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) PETRI-LAURELHURST FMLY LTD with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6260675), filed by Steven M Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fong, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Petri-Laurelhurst Fmly Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M Lewis
Represented By: Bonnie Nobuko Fong
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Lewis
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Bonnie Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETRI-LAURELHURST FMLY LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?