Cobb v. South Correctional Entity et al
Plaintiff: EC Edward Cobb
Defendant: South Correctional Entity, Grievance Program Manager, Brooks, Orten, SCORE Jail, Highline Medical Hospital Urgent Care, King County Jail Medical Staff and Highline Medical Hospital
Case Number: 2:2020cv00607
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from EC Edward Cobb re filing fee. (The court received a money order from the plaintiff in the amount of $5.00. However, since the filing fee for a 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint is $400.00, the money order will be returned to the plaintiff by the court's financial department. The deadline to cure the pending deficiency and sign the complaint form remains 5/26/2020. (copy of docket report & original complaint mailed to plaintiff via USPS on 6/12/2020) (ST)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address and REQUEST for Additional Time to Address Case filed by Plaintiff EC Edward Cobb. (Docket updated.) (ST)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The complaint form was not signed when filed with the court. Please sign and date the enclosed complaint form and return it to the court. Filer has until 5/26/2020 to correct (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint Form) **25 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(EC Cobb, Prisoner ID: 777576)(ST)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff EC Edward Cobb. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Docket Notice, #4 Prison Trust Account)**53 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(EC Cobb, Prisoner ID: 777576)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobb v. South Correctional Entity et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Correctional Entity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grievance Program Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCORE Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highline Medical Hospital Urgent Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County Jail Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highline Medical Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EC Edward Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?