Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC v. The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Comapny
Plaintiff: Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Comapny and The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv00613
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on JPML Consolidation and Transfer, filed by Plaintiff Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/4/2020, (Williams-Derry, Amy)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re parties' #9 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have until June 30, 2020 to file an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Response Deadline, filed by Defendant The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co. Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Bentson, Daniel)
May 20, 2020 Attorney Owen R Mooney add as counsel for The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co per #7 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co. on 4/29/2020, filed by Plaintiff Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel Rahn Bentson on behalf of Defendant The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co. (Bentson, Daniel)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC (Williams-Derry, Amy)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-00597-RSM; 2:20-cv-00598-MLP; 2:20-cv-00622-TSZ; 2:20-cv-00627-BJR, by Plaintiff Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC. (Williams-Derry, Amy)
April 24, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/1/2020. (MET)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 4/28/2020. (SG)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Comapny (SG)
April 23, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDMENT Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC (Williams-Derry, Amy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Comapny with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6287018) Attorney Amy C Williams-Derry added to party Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC(pty:pla), filed by Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Williams-Derry, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC v. The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Comapny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan's Bar-B-Q LLC
Represented By: Amy C Williams-Derry
Represented By: Maureen M Falecki
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Irene Margret Hecht
Represented By: Ian S Birk
Represented By: Lynn Lincoln Sarko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Comapny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Co
Represented By: Owen R Mooney
Represented By: Daniel Rahn Bentson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?