Pacific Endodontics PS v. Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00620
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re parties' #8 Stipulated Motion for a Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML. The matter is STAYED pending a ruling by the JPML concerning the transfer of this action for inclusion in MDL No. 2942 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Stay of Proceedings Pending Ruling on Consolidation and Transfer by JPML, filed by Defendant Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/22/2020, (Morrison, James)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent OHIO CASUALTY CORPORATION for Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Morrison, James)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James Raymond Morrison on behalf of Defendant Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Morrison, James)
May 22, 2020 Attorney Nathan L Nanfelt added as counsel for Pacific Endodontics PS per #5 Amended Complaint. (PM)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ohio Casualty Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND, filed by Pacific Endodontics PS.(Williams-Derry, Amy)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 6/24/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/10/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/17/2020. (LC)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Pacific Endodontics PS (Birk, Ian)
April 27, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/4/2020. (MET)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (SG)
April 24, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Ohio Casualty Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6291142), filed by Pacific Endodontics P.S.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birk, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Endodontics PS v. Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?