Roque v. Seattle Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Tony Roque
Defendant: Seattle Housing Authority
Amicus Curiae: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00658
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Having considered the parties' #40 Joint Status Report, the Court sets the following initial case scheduling deadlines: Deadline for Plaintiff to File First Amended Complaint is 7/17/2020, Deadline for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading to First Amended Complaint is 8/7/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/24/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/31/2020, Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2020. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 40 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fong, Bonnie)
June 22, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Max P Lapertosa on behalf of Amicus United States of America. (Lapertosa, Max)
June 22, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christina Fogg on behalf of Amicus United States of America. (Fogg, Christina)
June 17, 2020 Filing 37 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: Bonnie Fong, Conrad Reynoldson, Thomas Zito; Def Counsel: Leigh Ann Collings Tift; CR: Nickie Drury; TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/17/2020 re: #32 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Noncompliance with TRO. After hearing from both parties, the Court directs Defendant to place a sign over Plaintiff's reserved parking space, indicating that the space is reserved pursuant to court order in Case No. 2:20-cv-00658-RAJ. The sign must be at least 3 feet by 3 feet in dimension, and include a warning that violators will be towed. Additionally, Defendant is directed to permit Plaintiff's caregivers to use reserved staff parking every weekend from 6:00 PM Friday to 6:00 AM Monday, if Plaintiff's reserved spot is unavailable. (VE)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re #34 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sean Paul Betouliere for Plaintiff Tony Roque, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #33 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Thomas Philip Zito for Plaintiff Tony Roque, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 16, 2020 Set Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 6/17/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Richard A. Jones re: Plaintiff's #32 NOTICE of Noncompliance with TRO and Request for Hearing. (VE)
June 16, 2020 Filing 34 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sean Betouliere FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Tony Roque (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6405607 (Reynoldson, Conrad)
June 16, 2020 Filing 33 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Thomas Zito FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Tony Roque (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6405546 (Reynoldson, Conrad)
June 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH TRO AND REQUEST FOR HEARING ; filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fong, Bonnie)
June 12, 2020 Filing 31 Statement of Interest BRIEF re #14 Order to Show Cause,,, Terminate Motions,, by Amicus United States of America (Lapertosa, Max)
June 4, 2020 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Tony Roque mailed on 6/3/2020 (Fong, Bonnie)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: No later than 3:00 pm on 6/25/2020, the parties are ORDERED to submit a joint status report describing the outcome of Plaintiff's appeal hearing. Finally, consistent with this Court's oral ruling, the temporary restraining order (Dkt. #14 ) is hereby MODIFIED to require Defendant to provide Mr. Roque with one reserved parking spot, to be shared by Mr. Roque's caregivers. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
June 2, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: Bonnie Fong; Def Counsel: Leigh Ann Collings Tift; CR: Nancy Bauer; TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 6/2/2020. The Court hears a status update from counsel. The Court orders the parties to submit a Joint Status Report no later than 3:00 PM on 6/25/2020. Except as stated on the record, the Court maintains the status quo pursuant to its #14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court will issue a written order memorializing its directives stated orally on the record. (VE)
May 29, 2020 Set Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 6/2/2020 at 2:00 PM before Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 22, 2020 Filing 27 Fourth DECLARATION of Bonnie Fong filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
May 22, 2020 Filing 26 Third DECLARATION of Mark Bernstein filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
May 22, 2020 Filing 25 Third DECLARATION of Tony Roque filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
May 22, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque, TO RESPONSE to #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fong, Bonnie)
May 18, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #20 Response to Motion Denying Motion for Prelim Inj (Tift, Leigh Ann)
May 18, 2020 Filing 22 DECLARATION of O'Connor filed by Defendant Seattle Housing Authority re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Tift, Leigh Ann)
May 18, 2020 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Stegich filed by Defendant Seattle Housing Authority re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Tift, Leigh Ann)
May 18, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE, by Defendant Seattle Housing Authority, to #14 Order to Show Cause re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Tift, Leigh Ann) Modified on 5/20/2020 (MW).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. The parties' #18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER is granted. (VE)
May 12, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by parties (Fong, Bonnie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 Second DECLARATION of Service - Aaron Hayes filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Service - Aaron Hayes filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Leigh Ann Collings Tift on behalf of Defendant Seattle Housing Authority. (Tift, Leigh Ann)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: The temporary restraining order will become effective upon formal service of this Order and will remain in effect for 14 (fourteen) days, unless extended by order of the Court. Finally, Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before 5/18/2020, why the Court should not convert this temporary restraining order into a preliminary injunction. Plaintiff may file a reply on or before 5/22/2020. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
May 4, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Tony Roque (Fong, Bonnie)
May 4, 2020 Filing 12 Second DECLARATION of Bonnie Fong filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fong, Bonnie)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Richard A. Jones - Dep Clerk: Victoria Ericksen; Pla Counsel: Bonnie Fong; CR: Nickie Drury; TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/4/2020 regarding sufficiency of service of process upon Defendant. After hearing from counsel, the Court directs counsel for Plaintiff to file a declaration setting forth her efforts to effectuate proper service upon Defendant. The declaration shall be filed by 2:00 PM on 5/4/2020. (VE)
May 4, 2020 Set Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 5/4/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Service - Cannon Rogers filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Seattle Housing Authority (SG)
April 30, 2020 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SG)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Bonnie Fong filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fong, Bonnie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Tony Roque filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Mark Bernstein filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Dr. Matthew Jaffy filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fong, Bonnie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , filed by Plaintiff Tony Roque. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/30/2020, (Fong, Bonnie)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Seattle Housing Authority with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6306096), filed by Tony Roque. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fong, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roque v. Seattle Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Roque
Represented By: Bonnie Nobuko Fong
Represented By: Conrad Reynoldson
Represented By: Bonnie Fong
Represented By: Sean Paul Betouliere
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Housing Authority
Represented By: Leigh Ann Collings Tift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States of America
Represented By: Christina Fogg
Represented By: Max P Lapertosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?