Dougan v. The Children's Place Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00818
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Children's Place Inc (Durbin, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Kerry Alzate filed by Defendant The Children's Place Inc re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E)(Durbin, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, filed by Defendant The Children's Place Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/7/2020, (Durbin, Christopher)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sophia M Rios for Defendant The Children's Place Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re parties' #5 Stipulated Motion. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint is extended to 7/10/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michelle C. Doolin for Defendant The Children's Place Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sophia M. Rios FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Children's Place Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6416292 (Durbin, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michelle C. Doolin FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant The Children's Place Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6416269 (Durbin, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadline for Defendant's Response to Complaint, filed by Defendant The Children's Place Inc. Noting Date 6/22/2020, (Durbin, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher B. Durbin on behalf of Defendant The Children's Place Inc. (Durbin, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on The Children's Place, Inc. on 6/2/2020, filed by Plaintiff Elaine Dougan. (Corrington, Che)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant The Children's Place Inc (CDA)
June 1, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (CDA)
May 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Children's Place, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6370859), filed by Elaine Dougan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Proposed Summons)(Hattis, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dougan v. The Children's Place Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?