Hua v. Eggleston et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Hua
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad F Wolf, Jill A Eggleston and Ken Cuccinelli
Case Number: 2:2020cv00889
Filed: June 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings. Judge Barbara J. Rothstein no longer assigned to case. (LW)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants, signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 8 Consent Letter & Form (stricken as document did not attach): Doc #10 Consent Letter & Form (post corrected with form attached). (KAM)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/24/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (2nd Post Re: 8 as the form did not attach with the original post). (KAM)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline and [Proposed] Order, filed by Defendants Ken Cuccinelli, Jill A Eggleston, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad F Wolf. Noting Date 7/16/2020, (Fairchild, Katie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/23/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM) Modified on 7/17/2020 - see Doc #10 for corrected entry (KAM).
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendants Ken Cuccinelli, Jill A Eggleston, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security, Chad F Wolf. (Fairchild, Katie)
June 28, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to All defendants on 6/12/2020, filed by Plaintiff Ralph Hua. (Hua, Ralph)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE: Plaintiff Ralph Hua has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Issued as to All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(CDA)(mailed to plaintiff via US Mail)
June 6, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Ralph Hua (CDA)
June 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Summons(es) to be issued) (Receipt # SEA100942), filed by Ralph Hua. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons AG, #4 Summons AUSA, #5 Summons DHS, #6 Summons Eggleston, #7 Summons USCIS, #8 Email transmittal)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hua v. Eggleston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F Wolf
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill A Eggleston
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Hua
Represented By: Ralph Hua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?