Hillius et al v. Chen et al
Plaintiff: Sonja Lyons, Lisa Zehm, Mark Miedema, Steven Zehm, Douglas Scarlett, Mark Holmes, Daniel Lyons, Tom Staehr, Cheri Holmes, Scott Hillius and Angelique Scarlett
Defendant: Josh Williams, City of Lynden, Mount Emei Investment Inc., 18 Paradise LLP, Mount Tai Investment Inc., MJ Management, LLC, William (Mick) O'Bryan, Mao Hua Chen, William O'Bryan, Mount Tai Investment Inc, Mick, MJ Management LLC and Mount Emei Investment Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00902
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 27 LETTER to Whatcom County Supeior Court Remanding Case to State Court (Letter and certified copies of #26 order and docket sheet mailed to state court on 7/30/2020)(MW)
July 24, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated per #26 Order on Stipulated Motion. (MW)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting Parties' #25 Stipulated Motion to dismiss and remand: All claims asserted against defendants Mount Emei Investment Inc. and Mount Tai Investment Inc. are dismissed with prejudice; defendants Mount Emei Investment Inc. and Mount Tai Investment Inc. are dismissed from this action; all claims against Mao Hua Chen are dismissed without prejudice, and Mao Hua Chen shall be dismissed from the case without prejudice; all matters before the Court in this matter are stricken; this matter is remanded to Whatcom County Superior Court of the State of Washington. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 Stipulated MOTION to dismiss and remand, filed by Plaintiffs Scott Hillius, Cheri Holmes, Mark Holmes, Daniel Lyons, Sonja Lyons, Mark Miedema, Angelique Scarlett, Douglas Scarlett, Tom Staehr, Lisa Zehm, Steven Zehm. (Davis, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE, by Defendant City of Lynden, to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily (Rule 41(a)(2)). (Keeler, Lisa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Defendants Mao Hua Chen, Mount Emei Investment Inc, Mount Tai Investment Inc, to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily (Rule 41(a)(2)). (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE, by Defendants MJ Management LLC, William O'Bryan, Josh Williams, to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily (Rule 41(a)(2)). (Buri, Philip)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed Plaintiffs' motion to voluntarily dismiss the RICO claim and certain Defendants from this lawsuit pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) [Dkt. No. #19 ], the Court HEREBY ORDERS Defendants to file a response to the motion on or before July 22, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed on or before July 24, 2020. Authorized by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (TH)
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Defendants Mao Hua Chen, Mount Emei Investment Inc, Mount Tai Investment Inc, TO RESPONSE to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
July 14, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily (Rule 41(a)(2)), filed by Plaintiffs Scott Hillius, Cheri Holmes, Mark Holmes, Daniel Lyons, Sonja Lyons, Mark Miedema, Angelique Scarlett, Douglas Scarlett, Tom Staehr, Lisa Zehm, Steven Zehm. (Davis, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/11/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (GC)
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Scott Hillius, Cheri Holmes, Mark Holmes, Daniel Lyons, Sonja Lyons, Mark Miedema, Angelique Scarlett, Douglas Scarlett, Tom Staehr, Lisa Zehm, Steven Zehm, to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (Davis, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to the Standing Order for Civil Cases Setting Trial Date, Related Dates, and Court Procedures (Standing Order) [Dkt. No. #6 and #13 ], and the Court HEREBY STRIKES the noting date for 7/10/2020 [Dkt. No. #6 ] and the noting date for 7/24/2020 [ Dkt. No. #13 ]. Instead, pursuant to Section II.A. 3 of the Standing Order, the opposition to the motion is due twenty-one (21) days after the date on which the motion was filed and the reply is due fourteen (14) days after the opposition is filed. This Minute Order does not strike the motion; rather, it strikes the noting date. The Court will consider the motion upon the completion of briefing in accordance with the foregoing schedule. In the future, the Court expects the parties to comply with the terms of the Standing Order. Authorized by Barbara J. Rothstein. (PM)
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint; by City of Lynden.(Keeler, Lisa)
July 2, 2020 Attorney Lisa M Keeler added as counsel for City of Lynden per #12 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant City of Lynden. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting City of Lynden's Motion to Dismiss) Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Keeler, Lisa) Modified on 7/2/2020 to strike noting date per Judge Rothstein's Standing Order (PM).
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert Allen Carmichael Lisa M. Keeler on behalf of Defendant City of Lynden. (Carmichael, Robert) Modified on 7/2/2020 to correct name of appearing attorney (PM).
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS and Proceedings by Defendant 18 Paradise LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint; MJ Management, LLC Attorney Michael T Mumford added to party MJ Management LLC(pty:dft) by MJ Management LLC.(Mumford, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by MJ Management LLC (Mumford, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by 18 Paradise LLP.(VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Joinder JOINING #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, by Defendant MJ Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mumford, Michael)
June 18, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, MJ Mangement LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/25/2020. (MET)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, filed by Defendants Mao Hua Chen, Mount Emei Investment Inc, Mount Tai Investment Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/10/2020, (VandenBerghe, Benjamin) Modified on 7/2/2020: Modified on 7/2/2020 to strike noting date per Judge Rothstein's Standing Order (PM).
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Whatcom County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
June 15, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (RE)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mount Tai Investment Inc. (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mount Emei Investment Inc. (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 18 Paradise LLP (VandenBerghe, Benjamin)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whatcom County Superior Court, case number 20-2-00701-37; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6395328), filed by 18 Paradise LLP, Mount Tai Investment Inc., Mao Hua Chen, Mount Emei Investment Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - CICS, #5 Exhibit D - Consent for Removal Chen, Mount Tai Investment Inc., Mount Emei Investment Inc., #6 Exhibit E - Consent for Removal O'Bryan, Williams and MJ Management, LLC)(VandenBerghe, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillius et al v. Chen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Williams
Represented By: Philip James Buri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lynden
Represented By: Robert Allen Carmichael
Represented By: Lisa M Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Emei Investment Inc.
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18 Paradise LLP
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Tai Investment Inc.
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJ Management, LLC
Represented By: Philip James Buri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William (Mick) O'Bryan
Represented By: Philip James Buri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mao Hua Chen
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William O'Bryan
Represented By: Philip James Buri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Tai Investment Inc
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick
Represented By: Philip James Buri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJ Management LLC
Represented By: Philip James Buri
Represented By: Michael T Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Emei Investment Inc
Represented By: Henry G Ross
Represented By: Benjamin I VandenBerghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Lyons
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Zehm
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Miedema
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Zehm
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Scarlett
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Holmes
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lyons
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Staehr
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheri Holmes
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hillius
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelique Scarlett
Represented By: K David Andersson
Represented By: Robert Dallan Bunce
Represented By: Matthew F Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?