Landmark Technology A LLC v. Stoneway Electric Supply Co
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A LLC
Defendant: Stoneway Electric Supply Co
Case Number: 2:2020cv00974
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 30 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 9/16/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/2/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/9/2020. (LC)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Stoneway Electric Supply Co. on 7/1/2020, filed by Plaintiff Landmark Technology A LLC. (Lee, John)
July 3, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Landmark Technology A LLC (Lee, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Stoneway Electric Supply Co. (RE)
June 25, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Landmark Technology A LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/2/2020. (RE)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Landmark Technology A LLC (Lee, John)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant(s) Stoneway Electric Supply Co with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6421138) Attorney John A Lee added to party Landmark Technology A LLC(pty:pla), filed by Landmark Technology A LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120))(Lee, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Technology A LLC v. Stoneway Electric Supply Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stoneway Electric Supply Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology A LLC
Represented By: John A Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?