Taylor v. United States of America
Petitioner: Aubrey Taylor
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00999
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Court will GRANT petitioner's "Supplemental Request of Fed. R. Crim. P. 33 Motion" (Dkt. #6 ). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action be DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminatethe above captioned matter and to refile petitioners "Fed. R. Crim. P. 33 / Napue Violations / Brady Violations / Prosecutorial Misconduct Motion to Vacate Convictions and Dismiss Superseding Indictment (Second)" (Dkt. #1 ) under case number CR16-300RSL as a Rule 33 Motion for New Trial. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the government's "Motion to Stay" the proceedings in the above captioned matter (Dkt. #5 ) be DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) (cc: Petitioner via USPS on 8/13/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Convert Civil Action to a Motion Pursuant to FRCrP 33 Under Case Number 16cr300, filed by Petitioner Aubrey Taylor. Noting Date 8/7/2020 (MW)
July 6, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #4 RESPONSE, by Petitioner Aubrey Taylor: Per counsel, filed with incorrect event, refiled as docket #5 . (STP)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay , filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/24/2020, (Crisham, Catherine)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 DISREGARD per counsel, filed in error RESPONSE, by Petitioner Aubrey Taylor, to #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crisham, Catherine) Modified per counsel request, will refile with correct event on 7/6/2020 (STP).
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: petitioner via USPS on 7/1/2020) (ST)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 2255 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence, filed by Aubrey Taylor. Related to criminal case: 16-cr-999-RSL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: US Attorney Habeas
Represented By: Catherine L Crisham
Represented By: Rebecca Shapiro Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aubrey Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?