RGN-Seattle XVII LLC v. A&D Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: RGN-Seattle SVII, LLC and RGN-Seattle XVII LLC
Defendant: A&D Partners, LLC, Umpqua Bank, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation and A&D Partners LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01025
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff RGN-Seattle XVII LLC by A&D Partners LLC.(Taylor, Paul)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re Parties' #23 Stipulation. Defendant BNY Mellon will file/serve a response to the First Amended Complaint no later than Thursday, 10/1/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
August 31, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties (Brassfield, Gregory)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT re Parties' #21 Stipulation. Defendant BNY Mellon will file/serve a response to the First Amended Complaint no later than Monday, 8/31/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
August 20, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by parties re #11 Amended Complaint, (Todaro, Anthony)
August 19, 2020 Attorney Austin M. Rainwater added for The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation; per #20 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendant The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. (Todaro, Anthony)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: 3 days. Bench Trial is set for 9/13/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Joinder of Parties due by 9/14/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 3/17/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/17/2021, Discovery completed by 5/16/2021, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 5/30/2021, Dispositive motions due by 6/15/2021, Motions in Limine due by 8/16/2021, Pretrial Order due by 9/1/2021, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 9/8/2021 (KERR)
August 14, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 3. (Brassfield, Gregory)
July 29, 2020 Filing 17 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation (MW)
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS To The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation by Plaintiff RGN-Seattle XVII LLC (Brassfield, Gregory)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 8/14/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 PRAECIPE to attach document (Exhibit) G re #13 Redacted Document by Plaintiff RGN-Seattle XVII LLC (Brassfield, Gregory) Modified on 7/16/2020 - Note: filer encountered ECF issue and was unable to attach Exhibit G to docket #13 (KB).
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 REDACTION to #11 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff RGN-Seattle XVII LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit Redacted)(Brassfield, Gregory)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by A&D Partners LLC (Taylor, Paul)
July 15, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re #11 Amended Complaint, Exhibit F contains images of checks with unredacted account numbers and other personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (MW)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) A&D Partners LLC, The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, filed by RGN-Seattle XVII LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 SEALED Exhibit F, Gregory) Modified on 7/15/2020 (MW).
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Paul R Taylor on behalf of Defendant A&D Partners LLC. (Taylor, Paul)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER of Service of Summons by Plaintiff RGN-Seattle XVII LLC (mailed to A&D Partners, LLC on 7/13/2020) (Brassfield, Gregory) Modified on 7/14/2020 (MW).
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) A&D Partners LLC and Umpqua Bank. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Umpqua)(RE)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Gregory Brassfield for Plaintiff RGN-Seattle XVII LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric W Pinker for Plaintiff RGN-Seattle XVII LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS to A&D Partners and Umpqua Bank by Plaintiff RGN-Seattle XVII LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Umpqua Bank)(Hart, Kenneth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Greg A. Brassfield FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff RGN-Seattle SVII LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6444922 (Hart, Kenneth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric W. Pinker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff RGN-Seattle SVII LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6444896 (Hart, Kenneth)
July 6, 2020 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by RGN-Seattle SVII, LLC (Hart, Kenneth)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) RGN-Seattle SVII, LLC (Receipt # AWAWDC-6437607) Attorney Kenneth W Hart added to party RGN-Seattle SVII, LLC(pty:pla), filed by RGN-Seattle SVII, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hart, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RGN-Seattle XVII LLC v. A&D Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&D Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Anthony Todaro
Represented By: Austin M. Rainwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&D Partners LLC
Represented By: Paul R Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGN-Seattle SVII, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth W Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RGN-Seattle XVII LLC
Represented By: Kenneth W Hart
Represented By: Gregory Brassfield
Represented By: Eric W Pinker
Represented By: Scott Roberts Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?