Aspen Lodging Group LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Portland Hotel, LLC, KS Tacoma Hotel, LLC, Deluxe Restaurant, LLC, Dossier F&B, LLC, Theodore F&B, LLC, Aspen Lodging Group LLC, Aspen Mallory Holdings, LLC, Portland Governor Hotel Acquisition, LLC, 930 Sandy Bar, LLC, Aspen Tennessee, LLC, Villa Palm Springs Owner, LLC, Aspen Imperial, LLC, Hotel Ambassador Nola, LLC, Roosevelt Hotel Owner LLC, Vance Hotel Associates, LLC, 930 Sandy Bar LLC, Hotel Ambassador Nola LLC, Portland Governor Hotel Acquisition LLC, Aspen Imperial LLC, Aspen Mallory Holdings LLC, Vance Hotel Associates LLC, Theodore F&B LLC, Deluxe Restaurant LLC, Aspen Tennessee LLC, KS Tacoma Hotel LLC, Dossier F&B LLC, Portland Hotel LLC and Villa Palm Springs Owner LLC
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01038
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by 930 Sandy Bar LLC, Aspen Imperial LLC, Aspen Lodging Group LLC, Aspen Mallory Holdings LLC, Aspen Tennessee LLC, Deluxe Restaurant LLC, Dossier F&B LLC, Hotel Ambassador Nola LLC, KS Tacoma Hotel LLC, Portland Governor Hotel Acquisition LLC, Portland Hotel LLC, Roosevelt Hotel Owner LLC, Theodore F&B LLC, Vance Hotel Associates LLC, Villa Palm Springs Owner LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(McDermott, James)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Affiliated FM Insurance Company.(Sekits, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiffs shall file the Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 on or before 7/28/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(LH)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Factory Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate FMIC Holdings, Inc. for Affiliated FM Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Sekits, Matthew)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time , filed by Plaintiffs 930 Sandy Bar LLC, Aspen Imperial LLC, Aspen Lodging Group LLC, Aspen Mallory Holdings LLC, Aspen Tennessee LLC, Deluxe Restaurant LLC, Dossier F&B LLC, Hotel Ambassador Nola LLC, KS Tacoma Hotel LLC, Portland Governor Hotel Acquisition LLC, Portland Hotel LLC, Roosevelt Hotel Owner LLC, Theodore F&B LLC, Vance Hotel Associates LLC, Villa Palm Springs Owner LLC. Noting Date 7/13/2020, (McDermott, James)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/28/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/11/2020, by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (KD)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
July 7, 2020 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
July 7, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, All Plaintiffs and Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/14/2020. (RE)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Sekits, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Tonyha Davies re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BB)(Sekits, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Sekits re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Affiliated FM Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sekits, Matthew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-09395-5; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6440757), filed by Affiliated FM Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Remaining Lower Court Documents)(Sekits, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2020: #4 Plaintiff's Jury Demand) (RE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aspen Lodging Group LLC et al v. Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portland Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KS Tacoma Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deluxe Restaurant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dossier F&B, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore F&B, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Lodging Group LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Mallory Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portland Governor Hotel Acquisition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 930 Sandy Bar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Tennessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Villa Palm Springs Owner, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Imperial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotel Ambassador Nola, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Hotel Owner LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Hotel Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 930 Sandy Bar LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotel Ambassador Nola LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portland Governor Hotel Acquisition LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Imperial LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Mallory Holdings LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Hotel Associates LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore F&B LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deluxe Restaurant LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Tennessee LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KS Tacoma Hotel LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dossier F&B LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portland Hotel LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Villa Palm Springs Owner LLC
Represented By: James T McDermott
Represented By: Dwain Mark Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affiliated FM Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J Sekits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?