The Dentists Insurance Company v. Yousefian et al
Case Number: 2:2020cv01076
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' 93 Stipulated MOTION. Defendants' counterclaims relating to Business Interruption and Extra Expense coverage are stricken. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting Defendants' 90 Unopposed Motion to Supplement Record re 57 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting Parties' 82 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' deadline to file their reply in support of their motion for summary judgment is 8/12/2022. The Clerk of Court is directed to renote the motion for summary judgment for that date. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SR)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re Parties' 76 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Defendants' Reply Deadline. It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' deadline for replying to the cross-motions for partial summary judgment is hereby continued to Friday, 8/5/2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER re Parties' 74 Stipulated MOTION Re Extension of Expert Deadlines. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) are now due by 8/12/2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting Parties' 64 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines. Plaintiff to file combined Response and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by 6/20/2022. Defendant to file Response to cross-motion by 7/5/2022. Replies to respective cross-motions due by 7/15/2022. The cross-motions for summary judgment shall be noted on the Courts calendar for considerationon Friday, 7/15/2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SR)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting Parties' 61 Stipulated MOTION. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) now due by 7/25/2022. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting Defendants' 53 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file a motion to amend the complaint and attach a proposed pleading for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 37 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re Parties' 49 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re Parties' 35 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting Defendants' 31 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Within fourteen (14) days of this Order, defendants shall file their Supplemental and Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 24 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SR)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Defendants' 9 Motion to Stay and Compel Appraisal. This matter is hereby STAYED until the appraisal process is completed. The parties shall, within fourteen days of the final valuation determination, file a joint status repor t with the Court indicating whether a new trail date is needed and, if so, when discovery will be completed. Defendants' request for an award of fees is DENIED without prejudice to the issue being raised again prior to entry of judgment in this matter. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Dentists Insurance Company v. Yousefian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?