Mukai v. Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Warlita Mukai
Defendant: Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01098
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2020 Filing 9 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Warlita Mukai, TO RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decl of JLowell)(Lowell, Joshua)
August 14, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Judson D. Taylor filed by Defendant Geico Advantage Insurance Company re #5 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Taylor, Judson)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE, by Defendant Geico Advantage Insurance Company, to #5 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taylor, Judson)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #5 Second MOTION to Remand (Lowell, Joshua) Modified on 7/27/2020 (LH).
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 Second MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Warlita Mukai. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) Noting Date 8/21/2020, (Lowell, Joshua) Modified on 7/27/2020 (LH).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Defendant Geico Advantage Insurance Company (Taylor, Judson)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Geico Advantage Insurance Company (Taylor, Judson)
July 17, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/24/2020. (SG)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
July 17, 2020 Judge James L. Robart added. (SG)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-10230-0; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6467509) Attorney Rory W Leid, III added to party Geico Advantage Insurance Company(pty:dft), filed by Geico Advantage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-G, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leid, Rory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mukai v. Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warlita Mukai
Represented By: Joshua Benjamin Lowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Represented By: Judson Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?