Dodo International Inc et al v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Keith Fernandes, Dodo International Inc and Vahram Dughestani
Defendant: Eugene Elfrank, Jason Cross, Sam Adams, Cypress Creek Ventures LLC, Gratziela Crisovan, Alternative Resource Inc, Paul Donion, Klerson LLC, Isotex Health LLC, Law Office of Paul M Donion LLC, Richard Parker and Jason Martin
Case Number: 2:2020cv01116
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 PRAECIPE to attach document re #8 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Service by Plaintiff Dodo International Inc (Ankeny, Jason)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Dodo International Inc, Vahram Dughestani, Keith Fernandes. (Ankeny, Jason)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Service, filed by Plaintiff Dodo International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Substitute Service of Process) Noting Date 9/15/2020, (Ankeny, Jason)
September 15, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Motion for Substitute-Service, #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s),: Modified on 9/15/2020 to seal documents and strike through docket entries. Counsel to file redacted versions. (KB)
September 15, 2020 ***Motion terminated: #7 Proposed MOTION to Substitute Motion for Substitute-Service filed by Dodo International Inc. Counsel to refile redacted motion. (KB)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR Proposed MOTION to Substitute Motion for Substitute-Service, filed by Plaintiff Dodo International Inc. Noting Date 9/15/2020, (Ankeny, Jason) Modified on 9/15/2020 to strike docket entry at request of counsel (KB).
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Klerson LLC (an Oregon limited liability company), filed by Plaintiffs Dodo International Inc, Vahram Dughestani, Keith Fernandes. (Ankeny, Jason) Modified on 9/15/2020 to strike docket entry at request of filer (KB).
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Jason Martin (an indivdual), filed by Plaintiffs Dodo International Inc, Vahram Dughestani, Keith Fernandes. (Ankeny, Jason)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Dodo International Inc (Ankeny, Jason)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Sam Adams, Alternative Resource Inc, Gratziela Crisovan, Jason Cross, Cypress Creek Ventures LLC, Paul Donion, Eugene Elfrank, Isotex Health LLC, Klerson LLC, Law Office of Paul M Donion LLC, Jason Martin, Richard Parker. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Alternative Resource, #2 Summons-Crisovan, #3 Summons-Cross, #4 Summons-Cypress Creek, #5 Summons-Donion, #6 Summons-Elfrank, #7 Summons-Isotex, #8 Summons-Klerson, #9 Summons-Law Office of Donion, #10 Summons-Martin, #11 Summons-Parker)(RE)
July 20, 2020 U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE)
July 20, 2020 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff Dodo International Inc. must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 7/27/2020. (RE)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6472959), filed by Dodo International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Ankeny, Jason) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/20/2020)Civil Cover Sheet was scanned with Complaint. (RE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodo International Inc et al v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Elfrank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cypress Creek Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gratziela Crisovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternative Resource Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Donion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klerson LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isotex Health LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Paul M Donion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Fernandes
Represented By: Jason E Ankeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dodo International Inc
Represented By: Jason E Ankeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vahram Dughestani
Represented By: Jason E Ankeny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?