International Business Machines Corporation v. Zillow Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: International Business Machines Corporation
Defendant: Zillow Group Inc and Zillow Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01130
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Filed by Defendants Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Inc. Noting Date 11/20/2020, (Peaslee, Katherine)
September 14, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, filed by Defendants Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katherine Peaslee, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Katherine Peaslee, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Katherine Peaslee, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Katherine Peaslee, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Katherine Peaslee, #6 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/20/2020 10/9/2020, (Peaslee, Katherine) Modified on 9/18/2020 (MW).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER: The parties have submitted a Stipulated Protective Order for the Courts approval. The Court will enter the parties' proposed Stipulated Protective Order subject to the requirements of Paragraph 2, below. Notwithstanding Paragraph 14.4 of the Stipulated Protective Order, the following provision shall apply:Filing Protected Material. If a party wishes to use "confidential" or "protected" documents or information to support or oppose a motion, the following procedures shall apply. Counsel shall meet and confer before filing documents under seal. During the meet-and-confer process, counsel shall explore the options of removing the confidential designation and/or redacting the protected portions of the document at issue. To the extent possible, counsel shall submit, along with any document filed under seal, a stipulation and proposed order reciting the reasons for sealing the document. See Local Civil Rule 5(g); Kamakana v. City & Cty. of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006); Foltz v. State Farm Mut. Auto. Inc. Co., 331 F.3d 1122 (9th Cir. 2003). If counsel cannot reach agreement, then a properly noted motion to seal must be filed contemporaneously with the sealed document. If the party wishing to submit the material is not the party designating the material as confidential, the party wishing to submit the material shall provide at least seven (7) days' notice to the other party(ies), so that a motion to seal, if necessary, may be prepared by the designating party and filed at the same time as the material is submitted under seal to the Court. Counsel shall use the Case Management and Electronic Case Files ("CM/ECF") system to present materials under seal; counsel shall not provide original sealed materials to chambers and shall not provide working copies to chambers unless the materials are voluminous and working copies would otherwise be required under Local Civil Rule 10(e)(9). In association with any stipulation or motion to seal, the parties shall bring to the Court's attention the requested disposition of the confidential document in the event the stipulation or motion to seal is denied. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW)
August 20, 2020 Filing 31 SUPPLEMENT re #30 Joint Status Report ; Zillow's Response to IBM's Supplemental Brief to Show Cause Why the Court Should Not Address Patentability on the Merits Before the Close of Fact Discovery by Defendants Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Inc (Crosby, Ian)
August 20, 2020 Filing 30 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Farmer, Tyler)
August 6, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Amended Stipulated Protective Order by parties (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Farmer, Tyler)
August 6, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE Joint Notice Regarding Minute Order ; filed by Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation. (Farmer, Tyler)
August 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edgar Guy Sargent on behalf of Defendants Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Inc. (Sargent, Edgar)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, docket no. #25 , the deadline for defendants to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to 9/14/2020. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (LH)
July 31, 2020 Attorneys Ian B Crosby and Daniel J Shih added for Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Inc; per #24 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
July 31, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint by parties (Peaslee, Katherine)
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine Marie Peaslee on behalf of Defendants Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Inc. (Peaslee, Katherine)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER. In light of Zillow's Amended Answer and Counterclaims, docket no. 121 in C20-851, IBM's motion to dismiss, docket no. 117 in C20-851, is STRICKEN without prejudice as moot. On or before August 6, 2020, counsel shall meet and confer and file a stipulated protective order in both cases. On or before August 20, 2020, Zillow shall serve, in Case No. C20-851, amended invalidity contentions and non-infringement contentions that are consistent with Local Patent Rule 121. On or before August 20, 2020, counsel shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report. Until further order, the parties shall not file any motions in either of these cases without leave of the Court, except that Zillow may file a responsive motion in lieu of a responsive pleading in Case No. C20-1130. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(TH)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Karim Z Oussayef for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jun Tong for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John M Desmarais for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Dao for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian D Matty for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian Leary for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexandra E Kochian for Plaintff International Business Machines Corporation, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Karim Z. Oussayef FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6497982 (Harrigan, Arthur)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jun Tong FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6497976 (Harrigan, Arthur)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John M. Desmarais FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6497973 (Harrigan, Arthur)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Dao FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6497972 (Harrigan, Arthur)
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian D. Matty FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6497965 (Harrigan, Arthur)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian Leary FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6497962 (Harrigan, Arthur)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexandra E. Kochian FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6497934 (Harrigan, Arthur)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Zillow Inc on 7/23/2020, filed by Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation. (Farmer, Tyler)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Zillow Group Inc on 7/23/2020, filed by Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation. (Farmer, Tyler)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings as related to C20-851TSZ. Judge Ricardo S. Martinez no longer assigned to case. (LW)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Zillow Inc)(RE)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE)
July 22, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-00851-TSZ, by Plaintiff International Business Machines Corporation. (Farmer, Tyler)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by International Business Machines Corporation (Farmer, Tyler)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6477682) Attorney Tyler Lawrence Farmer added to party International Business Machines Corporation(pty:pla), filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #4 Summons Zillow Group, #5 Summons Zillow Inc)(Farmer, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Business Machines Corporation v. Zillow Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Arthur W. Harrigan, Jr.
Represented By: Tyler Lawrence Farmer
Represented By: John M Desmarais
Represented By: Jun Tong
Represented By: Alexandra E Kochian
Represented By: Brian D Matty
Represented By: Karim Z Oussayef
Represented By: Brian Leary
Represented By: John Dao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow Group Inc
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: Daniel J Shih
Represented By: Katherine Marie Peaslee
Represented By: Ian B Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow Inc
Represented By: Edgar Guy Sargent
Represented By: Daniel J Shih
Represented By: Katherine Marie Peaslee
Represented By: Ian B Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?