Mountech IP LLC v. HTC America Inc
Plaintiff: Mountech IP LLC
Defendant: HTC America, Inc and HTC America Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01168
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The time for Defendant HTC America, Inc. to answer, move, orotherwise respond to Plaintiff's Mountech IP LLC's Complaint is extended to October 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (To October 30, 2020), filed by Plaintiff Mountech IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/17/2020, (Mann, Philip)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CDA)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant HTC America Inc (CDA)
August 3, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Mountech IP LLC (Mann, Philip)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Howard Wernow for Plaintiff Mountech IP LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Howard L. Wernow FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mountech IP LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. BWAWDC-6501969 (Mann, Philip)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement against defendant(s) HTC America, Inc with JURY DEMAND, filed by Mountech IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #7 Summons)(Mann, Philip) (Prepayment Waived) Modified on 7/31/2020 FEE PAID receipt # AWAWDC-6501457 (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mountech IP LLC v. HTC America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mountech IP LLC
Represented By: Howard Wernow
Represented By: Philip P Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?