State of Washington v. United States National Archives and Records Administration
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: U.S. National Archives and Records Administration and United States National Archives and Records Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv01232
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/3/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States National Archives and Records Administration.(Fairchild, Katie)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. (Fairchild, Katie)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER VACATING ORDER: The Standing Order at Dkt. #3 is hereby VACATED. Counsel are reminded to familiarize themselves with the Federal rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rules of the Western District of Washington and the District's Electronic Filing Procedures. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on United States National Archives and Records Administration on 8/18/2020, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik for all further proceedings because it is related to Case No. CV 20-1231RSL. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to case. All pleadings filed in the future shall bear case numbers CV 20-1232 RSL. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (MW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ***VACATED per #6 Order*** STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) Modified on 8/21/2020 (LH).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. (RE)
August 18, 2020 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. National Archives and Records Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-6534685) Attorney Lauryn K. Fraas added to party State of Washington(pty:pla), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. United States National Archives and Records Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Lauryn K. Fraas
Represented By: Nathan Bays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. National Archives and Records Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States National Archives and Records Administration
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?