Hernandez v. United States Seafoods LLC
Plaintiff: Audelio Hernandez
Defendant: United States Seafoods LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01234
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Meliha Jusupovic on behalf of Defendant United States Seafoods LLC. (Jusupovic, Meliha)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by United States Seafoods LLC (Waller, Thomas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by United States Seafoods LLC.(Waller, Thomas)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/13/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/19/2020. (LC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Thomas George Waller on behalf of Defendant United States Seafoods LLC. (Waller, Thomas)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant United States Seafoods LLC on 8/25/2020 (Margulies, Jason)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States Seafoods LLC. (RE)
August 18, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (RE)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against defendant(s) United States Seafoods LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6534925) Attorney Jason R Margulies added to party Audelio Hernandez(pty:pla), filed by Audelio Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Margulies, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. United States Seafoods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audelio Hernandez
Represented By: Jason R Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Seafoods LLC
Represented By: Thomas George Waller
Represented By: Meliha Jusupovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?