Fisher v. City of Monroe et al
Plaintiff: Seth Fisher
Defendant: Amy Bright, Michael Fitzgerald, Ben Swanson, Tim Quenzer and City of Monroe
Case Number: 2:2020cv01253
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Barbara J Rothstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to Consolidate: The Court hereby CONSOLIDATES Seth Fisher v. City of Monroe et al., Cause No. 2:20-cv-01253 into City of Monroe v. Fisher, Cause No. 2:20-cv-01308. Cause No. 2:20-cv-01253 shall be discontinued and the underlying litigation shall proceed in Cause No. 2:20-cv-01308. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LH)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/3/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/10/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ; by Plaintiff Seth Fisher. (Mathisen, Ryan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan Shawn Mathisen on behalf of Plaintiff Seth Fisher. (Mathisen, Ryan)
September 1, 2020 NOTE: Document #7 was filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney Ryan S. Mathisen is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (LH)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiff Seth Fisher. Noting Date 9/11/2020, (Mathisen, Ryan)
August 21, 2020 Attorney Joseph Zachary Lell terminated as counsel for Michael Fitzgerald. Notice to Add Attorneys docketed in error. (LH)
August 20, 2020 Attorney Joseph Zachary Lell for Michael Fitzgerald added; per #6 Answer to Complaint. (LH) Modified to strike on 8/21/2020 (LH).
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by Amy Bright, City of Monroe, Michael Fitzgerald, Tim Quenzer, Ben Swanson.(Rosenberg, Adam)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joseph Zachary Lell on behalf of Defendant Amy Bright, City of Monroe, Tim Quenzer, and Ben Swanson. (Lell, Joseph) Modified to add all represented Defendants on 8/21/2020 (LH).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SG)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
August 20, 2020 Judge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (SG)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Amy Bright, City of Monroe, Michael Fitzgerald, Tim Quenzer, Ben Swanson (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket, #2 Case Info. Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Complaint, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Notice of Appearance)(Rosenberg, Adam)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 20-2-03961-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6541788), filed by Amy Bright, City of Monroe, Ben Swanson, Tim Quenzer, Michael Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Rosenberg, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. City of Monroe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Bright
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Joseph Zachary Lell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fitzgerald
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Joseph Zachary Lell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Swanson
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Joseph Zachary Lell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Quenzer
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Joseph Zachary Lell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Monroe
Represented By: Adam Rosenberg
Represented By: Joseph Zachary Lell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Fisher
Represented By: Bruce Chalgren Galloway
Represented By: Ryan Shawn Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?