Taylor v. Ferguson et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Micheal Taylor
Defendant: Brian T Moran and Bob Ferguson
Case Number: 2:2020cv01262
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 Complaint filed by Christopher Micheal Taylor. Objections to R&R due by 11/5/2020, Noting Date 11/6/2020. A copy of this R&R has been mailed to plaintiff on 10/15/20. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (Attachments: #1 R&R Proposed Order, #2 R&R Proposed Judgment)(GB)
October 14, 2020 Filing 6 1983 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Micheal Taylor.(SG)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance) by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SG) Modified on 10/15/2020 cc: Plaintiff via USPS on or about 10/15/20, finance dept. Colorado Dept. of Corrections (SG).
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Theiler, filed by Christopher Micheal Taylor. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account)(ST)
September 8, 2020 IFP deficiency corrected. (ST)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 LETTER sent re IFP deficiency; - The filing fee requirement must be met. Please submit either the full $400.00 filing fee or an application for In Forma Pauperis (IFP) status.- Please provide a certified copy of your prison trust account statement showing transactions for the last six months. Filer has until 9/21/2020 to correct (SG)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Plaintiff Christopher Micheal Taylor (NO FILING FEE/NO IFP) (Attachments: #1 Letter)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Micheal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?