Parten et al v. V4L et al
Plaintiff: Ilesse Condominium Association, G. Lee Finley, Randall Parten, Idlesse Condominium Association and G Lee Finley
Defendant: V4L, John 1-3 Does, Vapor and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 2:2020cv01275
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Rod McInnis filed by Defendant V4L re #13 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue, or Alternatively, to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration (Silk, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of John M. Silk filed by Defendant V4L re #13 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue, or Alternatively, to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration (Silk, John)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue, or Alternatively, to Stay Proceedings Pending Completion of Arbitration, filed by Defendant V4L. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/23/2020, (Silk, John)
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by V4L.(Silk, John)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to File Answer by parties re #1 Notice of Removal (Silk, John)
September 15, 2020 Reset Deadline: The Court grants the parties' #11 STIPULATION Extending Deadline to File Answer. The date for Defendant Vapor 4 Life to file an answer or other response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 9/23/2020, with any jury demand to be filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 38. (cc: Plaintiff Finley via USPS) (VE)
September 1, 2020 Reset Deadline: The Court grants the parties' #10 STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint. The date for Defendant Vapor 4 Life to file an answer or other response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended to 9/16/2020, with any jury demand to be filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 38. (cc: Plaintiff Finley via USPS) (VE)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Answer Complaint by parties re #1 Notice of Removal (Silk, John)
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant V4L (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Silk, John)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Whatcom County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (Sent letter to plaintiff's counsel via ECF) (RE)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Whatcom County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER: Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
August 26, 2020 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by V4L (Silk, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant V4L (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Silk, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Whatcom County Superior Court, case number 20-2-00653-37; (Receipt # AWAWDC-6552883), filed by V4L. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint)(Silk, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parten et al v. V4L et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V4L
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-3 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapor
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilesse Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Lee Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Parten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Idlesse Condominium Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G Lee Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?