Madrid et al v. CertainTeed Corporation
Plaintiff: Natalie Weisberg and Gregory Madrid
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv01285
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties (Reiten, Mary)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER by parties (Reiten, Mary)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint; by CertainTeed Corporation.(McKillop, Eileen)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Counsel Eileen I. McKillop, on behalf of Defendant, on 9/19/2020. (Reiten, Mary)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant CertainTeed Corporation (TH)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRAECIPE re #10 Praecipe to Attach Document, #8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Gregory Madrid, Natalie Weisberg (Reiten, Mary)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRAECIPE to attach document re #8 Amended Complaint, #9 Praecipe for a Summons by Plaintiffs Gregory Madrid, Natalie Weisberg (Reiten, Mary)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #8 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Gregory Madrid, Natalie Weisberg (Reiten, Mary)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) CertainTeed Corporation, filed by Gregory Madrid, Natalie Weisberg.(Reiten, Mary)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CertainTeed Corporation (McKillop, Eileen)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/7/2020, Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2020. (GT)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (SG)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant CertainTeed Corporation (McKillop, Eileen)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (SG)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 9/3/2020. (SG)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECLARATION of Eileen McKillop re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant CertainTeed Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McKillop, Eileen)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 20-2-12652-7; (Receipt # BWAWDC-6556624) Attorney Eileen I McKillop added to party CertainTeed Corporation(pty:dft), filed by CertainTeed Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKillop, Eileen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrid et al v. CertainTeed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Weisberg
Represented By: Mary B Reiten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Madrid
Represented By: Mary B Reiten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation
Represented By: Eileen I McKillop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?