Kinnucan v. National Security Agency et al
Plaintiff: Michelle L Kinnucan and Michelle J Kinnucan
Defendant: Defense Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency, Department of Defense and Central Intelligence Agency
Case Number: 2:2020cv01309
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Marsha J Pechman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/16/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (GC)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Michelle J Kinnucan re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Arnold, Allexia)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/16/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Central Intelligence Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Fairchild, Katie)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency. (Fairchild, Katie)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Central Intelligence Agency, Defense Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency. (Attachments: #1 Summons- Defense Intelligence, #2 Summons- National Security, #3 Summons- Dept of Defense)(RE)
September 2, 2020 Judge David W. Christel added. (RE)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6569887) Attorney Caesar David Kalinowski added to party Michelle L Kinnucan(pty:pla), filed by Michelle L Kinnucan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Kalinowski, Caesar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinnucan v. National Security Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Security Agency
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Represented By: Katie Denise Fairchild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L Kinnucan
Represented By: Caesar David Kalinowski
Represented By: Allexia Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle J Kinnucan
Represented By: Allexia Arnold
Represented By: Caesar David Kalinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?