Heathcote v. Grande Games Limited
Plaintiff: William Heathcote
Defendant: Grande Games Limited
Case Number: 2:2020cv01310
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Strike the case schedule. The Case Schedule in this case is stricken. Plaintiffs shall report back to the Court on or before March 22, 2021, regarding service of the complaint on Defendant. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Strike Case Schedule , filed by Plaintiff William Heathcote. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/30/2020, (Noel, Wright)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joint Status Report due by 10/28/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/14/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/21/2020. (LC)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Grande Games Limited (CDA)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (CDA)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #2 Praecipe for a Summons, #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff William Heathcote. (Noel, Wright)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff William Heathcote (Noel, Wright)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Grande Games Limited with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # BWAWDC-6570204), filed by William Heathcote.(Noel, Wright)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heathcote v. Grande Games Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Heathcote
Represented By: Wright A Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grande Games Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?