El Papel LLC et al v. Inslee et al
Plaintiff: El Papel, LLC, Berman 2, LLC, Karvell Li, El Papel LLC and Berman 2 LLC
Defendant: Jenny A Durkan, Jay R Inslee and City of Seattle
Amicus Curiae: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Washington State Pro Bono Council, Columbia Legal Services Inc, Northwest Justice Project, Tenants Union of Washington State, American Civil Liberties Union of Washington, Washington Low Income Housing Alliance, City of Chicago and 16 Local Governments, Building Changes and Tenant Law Center
Case Number: 2:2020cv01323
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Referring Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 53 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 3-4. (Blevins, Ethan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 52 Second DECLARATION of Ethan W. Blevins filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17)(Blevins, Ethan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 51 Second DECLARATION of Karvell Li filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit signature of Karvell Li, #2 Exhibit 16)(Blevins, Ethan)
October 23, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Blevins, Ethan)
October 22, 2020 Filing 49 Amicus BRIEF by Amicus City of Chicago and 16 Local Governments (Sands, Darin)
October 22, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott Crain on behalf of Amicus Parties Building Changes, Northwest Justice Project, Tenants Union of Washington State, Washington Low Income Housing Alliance. (Crain, Scott)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting Amicus Parties' #44 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction: Amici shall file the amicus brief on or before 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MW)
October 22, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Darin M Sands on behalf of Amicus City of Chicago and 16 Local Governments. (Sands, Darin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 45 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Erin B. Bernstein FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Amicus City of Chicago and 16 Local Governments (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6683260 (Sands, Darin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave To File Brief As Amici Curiae in Support of Defendants, filed by Amicus City of Chicago and 16 Local Governments. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/21/2020, (Sands, Darin)
October 21, 2020 Filing 43 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by Amicus Parties American Civil Liberties Union of Washington, Building Changes, Columbia Legal Services Inc, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Northwest Justice Project, Tenant Law Center, Tenants Union of Washington State, Washington Low Income Housing Alliance, Washington State Pro Bono Council (Crain, Scott)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Amicus Parties' #41 Motion for Leave to File Amici Curiae: The amicus brief shall be filed on or before 10/23/2020. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MW)
October 21, 2020 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief, filed by Amicus Parties Northwest Justice Project, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Building Changes, American Civil Liberties Union of Washington, Columbia Legal Services Inc, Washington Low Income Housing Alliance, Washington State Pro Bono Council, Tenant Law Center, Tenants Union of Washington State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/21/2020, (Crain, Scott)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #39 Motion to File a Consolidated Reply Brief in Excess of Page Limits: Plaintiffs' consolidated reply brief in support of the motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. #16 ) shall not exceed 18 pages. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones.(MW)
October 19, 2020 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION to File a Consolidated Reply Brief re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li. Noting Date 10/19/2020, (Blevins, Ethan)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES: The Clerk shall strike the current initial disclosures deadline, and the parties shall propose a different deadline in their joint status report. Otherwise, the Court's pretrial scheduling order (Dkt. #13 ) remains in effect. Signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (MW)
October 16, 2020 Filing 37 PRAECIPE re #29 Declaration of Jim Baumgart by Defendant Jay R Inslee (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibits N-Z)(Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Jody Wirtz filed by Defendant Jay R Inslee re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Samantha Shurtz filed by Defendant Jay R Inslee re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Mike Fulop filed by Defendant Jay R Inslee re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Brian H. Rowe filed by Defendant Jay R Inslee re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Dr. Christopher J. L. Murray filed by Defendant Jay R Inslee re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Kathy Lofy, MD filed by Defendant Jay R Inslee re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Kathryn Leathers filed by Defendant Jay R Inslee re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I)(Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Jim Baumgart filed by Defendant Jay R Inslee re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-M, #2 Exhibit N-Z)(Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Defendant Jay R Inslee, to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rowe, Brian)
October 14, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Defendants City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan, to #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Wynne, Roger)
October 13, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Alvarado filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Alvarado Decl. Exhibit 1 (Home Base first page)(Wynne, Roger)
October 13, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Roger Wynne filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 1 WSERFC Update Sept 16 2020, #2 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 2 WSERFC Update Dec 16 2019, #3 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 3 WSERFC Revised Sept 2020, #4 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 4 Losing Home (2018), excerpts, #5 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 5 CDC Order, #6 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 6 2020-03-05-Res 31937 Amending Mayoral Proclamation, #7 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 7 2020-03-14-Mayor's Moratorium, #8 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 8 2020-03-16-Res 31938, Amending Emergency Order on Res Evictions, #9 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 9 CDC Airborne Transmission, #10 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 10 Matorin Order (MA), #11 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 11 SF Apt order (CA), #12 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 12 SF Apt abandonment (CA), #13 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 13 JL Props order (IL), #14 Exhibit Wynne Decl. Exhibit 14 Gregory Real Estate order (AZ))(Wynne, Roger)
October 13, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Laurie Menzel filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Ex. 1 Certificate of Formation, #2 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Ex 2 20200114 Annual Report, #3 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Ex. 3 Certificate of Formation, #4 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Ex. 4 20200716 Annual Report, #5 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Ex. 5 Property Report, #6 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Ex. 6 Property Report, #7 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Ex. 7 Property Report, #8 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Ex. 8 RRIO Record Number_001-0133695, #9 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Property Report, #10 Exhibit Menzel Decl. Property Report, #11 Exhibit Menzel Decl. RRIO Record Number_001-0140500)(Wynne, Roger)
October 13, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Ellerbrook filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Wynne, Roger)
October 5, 2020 Attorney Erica R. Franklin added for City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan; per #22 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Roger Douglas Wynne on behalf of Defendants City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan. (Wynne, Roger)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action in King County Superior Court, case number in other court 20-2-13969-6 SEA ; filed by Defendants City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan. (Wynne, Roger)
September 21, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Karvell Li filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15)(Blevins, Ethan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Osho Berman, Berman 2, LLC filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14)(Blevins, Ethan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Mark Travers, El Papel, LLC filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13)(Blevins, Ethan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Ethan W. Blevins filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li re #16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Blevins, Ethan)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) Noting Date 10/23/2020, (Blevins, Ethan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Jay R Inslee mailed on 9/14/2020 (Blevins, Ethan)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant City of Seattle mailed on 9/14/2020; Jenny A Durkan mailed on 9/14/2020 (Blevins, Ethan)
September 11, 2020 JSR due NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 10/23/2020. (KAM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 10/23/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/2/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/16/2020, by Judge J Richard Creatura. NOTE: A trial date will be set by the assigned District Judge, the Honorable Richard A. Jones, if the case is not resolved by settlement or dispositive motion. (KAM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard A. Jones and referred to Judge J Richard Creatura for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/18/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kathryn Daly Valois for plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC and Karvell Li, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kathryn D. Valois FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Berman 2 LLC, El Papel LLC, Karvell Li (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6589546 (Hodges, Brian)
September 10, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #7 Notice of Appearance : Modified docket text to indicate that attorney represents defendant Jenny A Durkan (in addition to City of Seattle). (KB)
September 9, 2020 Attorney Roger Douglas Wynne for City of Seattle, Roger Douglas Wynne and Jeffrey S Weber for Jenny A Durkan added; per #7 Notice of Appearance. (KB)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey S Weber on behalf of Defendants City of Seattle and Jenny A Durkan (Weber, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/10/2020 to identify all parties represented (KB).
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Hunt Rowe on behalf of Defendant Jay R Inslee. (Rowe, Brian)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Zachary Pekelis Jones on behalf of Defendant Jay R Inslee. (Jones, Zachary)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey T Even on behalf of Defendant Jay R Inslee. (Even, Jeffrey)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) City of Seattle, Jenny A Durkan, Jay R Inslee (Attachments: #1 Summons-Durkan, #2 Summons-Inslee)(RE)
September 8, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (RE)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Berman 2, LLC, El Papel, LLC, Karvell Li (Blevins, Ethan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6576131) Attorney Ethan W Blevins added to party Berman 2, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ethan W Blevins added to party El Papel, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Ethan W Blevins added to party Karvell Li(pty:pla), filed by El Papel, LLC, Karvell Li, Berman 2, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Summons to Jay R. Inslee, #12 Summons to Jenny A. Durkan, #13 Summons to The City of Seattle)(Blevins, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Papel LLC et al v. Inslee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Papel, LLC
Represented By: Ethan W Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berman 2, LLC
Represented By: Ethan W Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karvell Li
Represented By: Ethan W Blevins
Represented By: Brian T Hodges
Represented By: Kathryn Daly Valois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Papel LLC
Represented By: Brian T Hodges
Represented By: Ethan W Blevins
Represented By: Kathryn Daly Valois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berman 2 LLC
Represented By: Brian T Hodges
Represented By: Ethan W Blevins
Represented By: Kathryn Daly Valois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny A Durkan
Represented By: Roger Douglas Wynne
Represented By: Erica R. Franklin
Represented By: Jeffrey S Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay R Inslee
Represented By: Zachary Pekelis Jones
Represented By: Jeffrey T Even
Represented By: Brian Hunt Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Roger Douglas Wynne
Represented By: Erica R. Franklin
Represented By: Jeffrey S Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington State Pro Bono Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Columbia Legal Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Northwest Justice Project
Represented By: Scott Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tenants Union of Washington State
Represented By: Scott Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington Low Income Housing Alliance
Represented By: Scott Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: City of Chicago and 16 Local Governments
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Building Changes
Represented By: Scott Crain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Tenant Law Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?