Omega Patents LLC v. Firstech LLC
Plaintiff: Omega Patents, LLC and Omega Patents LLC
Defendant: Firstech, LLC and Firstech LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01344
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (KAM)
November 3, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Jason Lee, Myungja Lee, Jessica Bissell, and Justin Lee no as Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Firstech LLC (Graham, Lawrence) Modified on 11/3/2020 (KMC).
October 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/6/2020. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM)
October 29, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Firstech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/20/2020, (Graham, Lawrence)
October 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Lawrence D Graham on behalf of Defendant Firstech LLC. (Graham, Lawrence)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Ryan Santurri for Plaintiff Omega Patents LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brian R Gilchrist for Plaintiff Omega Patents LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Ryan T. Santurri FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Omega Patents LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6623720 (Denkenberger, John)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brian R. Gilchrist FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Omega Patents LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6623706 (Denkenberger, John)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Firstech, LLC on 9/15/2020, filed by Plaintiff Omega Patents LLC. (Denkenberger, John)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Firstech LLC. (RE)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (RE)
September 11, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (RE)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating Kenneth Flick no as a Corporate Parents and/or Affiliate. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Omega Patents, LLC (Denkenberger, John) Modified on 9/16/2020 (KMC).
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Firstech, LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6589464) Attorney John D Denkenberger added to party Omega Patents, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Omega Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)(Denkenberger, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omega Patents LLC v. Firstech LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstech, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firstech LLC
Represented By: Lawrence D Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omega Patents, LLC
Represented By: John D Denkenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omega Patents LLC
Represented By: Brian R Gilchrist
Represented By: Ryan Santurri
Represented By: John D Denkenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?