Ezzeddin v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Mr Ezzeddin Ezzeddin and Ezzeddin Ezzeddin
Defendant: Chad F Wolf, USCIS, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Department of Homeland Security Citizenship & Immigration Services, Emilia Bardini, Cynthia Munita, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chad Wolf, Kenneth Cuccinelli and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2020cv01359
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Civil Process Clerk, Western District of Washington on 10/23/2020, filed by Plaintiff Ezzeddin Ezzeddin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Proof of Service, #2 Certificate of Service Proof of Service, #3 Certificate of Service Proof of Service, #4 Certificate of Service Proof of Service, #5 Certificate of Service Proof of Service, #6 Certificate of Service Proof of Service, #7 Certificate of Service Proof of Service)(Manclark, Grant)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Emilia Bardini, Kenneth Cuccinelli, Cynthia Munita, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (PM)
October 14, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiff Ezzeddin Ezzeddin (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Manclark, Grant)
September 15, 2020 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SG)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiff Ezzeddin Ezzeddin. (Manclark, Grant)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Mandamus against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6596942) Attorney Grant T Manclark added to party Ezzeddin Ezzeddin(pty:pla), filed by Ezzeddin Ezzeddin.(Manclark, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ezzeddin v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilia Bardini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Munita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr Ezzeddin Ezzeddin
Represented By: Grant T Manclark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ezzeddin Ezzeddin
Represented By: Grant T Manclark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?