DiMarco et al v. Coates et al
Plaintiff: John F Dimarco and Joseph Serpente
Defendant: Coates Innovations LLC doing business as Support The Foot and Lori Coates
Case Number: 2:2020cv01396
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from District of New Jersey, Camden division and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
September 21, 2020 Judge J Richard Creatura added. (RE)
September 21, 2020 Filing 35 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey, Case Number 1:19-cv-15597.
September 18, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER to TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/18/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 33 Letter from Henry Price. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(PYRICH, ALISSA) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
April 24, 2020 Filing 31 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 30 Letter. (PYRICH, ALISSA) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting letter request to reinstate this matter pursuant to the August 29, 2019 Order; Grating the parties' request to submit responsive briefs seven days following the initial submissions. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/8/2020. (dmr) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 28 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/27/2020. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER - The Court having been advised during the telephone conference of even date, that the parties efforts towards settlement have been unsuccessful, Counsel are directed to file a letter with The Honorable Renee M. Bumb U.S.D.J. setting forth a proposed briefing scheduling for the motions as directed in the order at Dkt. No. 12. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on February 27, 2020. (Williams, Karen) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER Upon the request of Henry Price, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the telephone status conference previously set for February 24, 2020, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the telephone status conference is February 27, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/24/20. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court hereby modifies the TIME ONLY of the February 24, 2020 telephone status conference previously set for 3:30 p.m. The NEW TIME of the telephone status conference is 2:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 2/24/20. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER This matter having come before the Court on the letter dated January 30, 2020, from Alissa Pyrich, Esquire, counsel for Plaintiffs; and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the telephone status conference scheduled for January 31, 2020, the request is GRANTED. The new date and time for the telephone status conference is February 24, 2020, at 3:30 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiffs shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 1/31/2020. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 Letter from Plaintiff's counsel requesting adjournment of case management conference. (PYRICH, ALISSA) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for January 31, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/23/2019. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/23/2019. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 21 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER The Court hereby resets the telephone status conference previously set for December 9, 2019. The NEW date and time of the telephone status conference is December 23, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/18/19. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated November 15, 2019 from William S. Bloom, Esquire, counsel for defendants, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the telephone status conference previously set for November 19, 2019, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the telephone status conference is December 9, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/18/2019. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: In-Person Settlement Conference held on 10/23/2019. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for November 19, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 10/23/19. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated September 11, 2019 from William S. Bloom, Esquire, counsel for defendant, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to permit defendant to appear by telephone for the in-person Settlement Conference, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 9/11/19. (nar) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 Letter from Defendant re #12 Order,, Set Hearings,. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER In light of the August 29, 2019, Order scheduling an in-person settlement conference for October 23, 2019, and administratively terminating this matter (Dkt. No. #12 ), the Initial Conference scheduled for September 5, 2019, is hereby ADJOURNED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 08/30/2019. (Solomon, D) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
August 29, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (dmr) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER scheduling an in-person Settlement Conference for 10/23/2019 at 2:00 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams, etc.; ORDERED that this matter is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED, subject to reactivation upon notice from the parties that settlement efforts have been unsuccessful, etc. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/29/2019. (dmr) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Telephone Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/28/2019. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, ) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER The Court has received the parties pre-motion conference letters, regarding Defendants proposed motion to dismiss [Dkt. Nos. 6, 9], and finds that such a conference would be helpful in this instance. The Court will therefore hold a pre-motion telephonic conference on this matter on Wednesday, August 28, at 3:30 PM. The parties should be prepared to discuss their respective valuations of the amount in controversy in this matter. Counsel for Defendants shall kindly initiate the conference call.. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/14/2019. (Costigan, Roberta) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Letter re #6 Letter. (PYRICH, ALISSA) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon the pre-motion conference letter filed by Defendants Lori Coates and Coates Innovations, LLC, on July 29, 2019 [Dkt. No. 6]. Plaintiffs John F. DiMarco and Joseph Serpente have failed to address Defendants letter within five (5) business days as required under Paragraph I.A of this Courts Individual Rules and Procedures. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall show cause before this Court within three (3) business, explaining why they have failed to timely respond AND why the relief Defendants seek in their pre-motion letter should not be granted. If no response is filed, the Court will likely dismiss this matter for failure to prosecute, subject to re-opening only upon good cause shown. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/08/2019. (Costigan, Roberta) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ALISSA PYRICH on behalf of JOHN F DIMARCO, JOSEPH SERPENTE (PYRICH, ALISSA) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon a pre-motion letter filed by Defendants Lori Coates and Coates Innovations, LLC, on July 25, 2019 [Dkt. No. 4], regarding a proposed Motion to Dismiss. Although Defendants state that they plan to seek dismissal on personal jurisdiction grounds, the letter is otherwise devoid of any information regarding the nature of the claims set forth in Plaintiff's Complaint, a rebuttal of the stated basis for personal jurisdiction in Plaintiff's Complaint, or an explanation of why Defendants removed the matter to this Court if personal jurisdiction was lacking. Defendant is hereby ORDERED to submit a new pre-motion letter addressing these issues within three (3) business days. Plaintiffs should wait to submit a response until after Defendants' new letter is filed.. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 07/26/2019. (Costigan, Roberta) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (ssp, ) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 19, 2019 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The State Court Complaint submitted by ALISSA PYRICH appears to have address information that does not match the court's records. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account under the 'Utilities' tab in CM/ECF. (ssp, ) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ssp, ) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 02:30 PM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/19/2019. (ssp, ) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LORI COATES, COATES INNOVATIONS. (BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COATES INNOVATIONS, LORI COATES from Burlington Superior Court, case number L-1188-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9828714), filed by COATES INNOVATIONS, LORI COATES. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit)(BLOOM, WILLIAM) [Transferred from njd on 9/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiMarco et al v. Coates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John F Dimarco
Represented By: ALISSA PYRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Serpente
Represented By: ALISSA PYRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coates Innovations LLC doing business as Support The Foot
Represented By: WILLIAM S. BLOOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Coates
Represented By: WILLIAM S. BLOOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?