Anderson v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Teresa Anderson
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01457
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: Five (5). (Buhite, Russell)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint For Breach of Contract, Bad Faith, and Violation of the Insurance Fair Conduct Act by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company.(Buhite, Russell)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (Buhite, Russell)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Parties' #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than 11/16/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Breach of Contract, Bad Faith, and Violation of the Insurance Fair Conduct Act, filed by Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/19/2020, (Buhite, Russell)
October 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Russell Scott Buhite on behalf of Defendant The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Buhite, Russell)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company (SG)
October 2, 2020 Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (SG)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6634824), filed by Teresa Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Engle, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Anderson
Represented By: Aaron Isak Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell Scott Buhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?