Healy v. Milliman Inc
Plaintiff: James Healy
Defendant: Milliman, Inc d/b/a Intelliscript and Milliman Inc doing business as Intelliscript
Case Number: 2:2020cv01473
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/8/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/16/2021, Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2021. (GT)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rust Murray on behalf of Plaintiff James Healy. (Murray, Jennifer)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Attorneys Daniel Andrew Brown and Frank S Harrison added as counsel for Milliman Inc per #11 Notice of Appearance. (PM)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rodney L Umberger, Jr on behalf of Defendant Milliman Inc. (Umberger, Rodney)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Milliman, Inc. d/b/a Intelliscript on 10/13/2020, filed by Plaintiff James Healy. (Terrell, Beth)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Milliman Inc. (RE)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #4 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Lauren KW Brennan for Plaintiff James Healy, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James A Francis for Plaintiff James Healy, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Soumilas for Plaintiff James Healy, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Lauren KW Brennan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff James Healy (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6645112 (Terrell, Beth)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James A. Francis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff James Healy (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6645110 (Terrell, Beth)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Soumilas FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff James Healy (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6645099 (Terrell, Beth)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against defendant(s) Milliman, Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6642980) Attorney Beth E Terrell added to party James Healy(pty:pla), filed by James Healy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Terrell, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Healy v. Milliman Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milliman, Inc d/b/a Intelliscript
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milliman Inc doing business as Intelliscript
Represented By: Frank S Harrison
Represented By: Rodney L Umberger, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Andrew Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Healy
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Adrienne McEntee
Represented By: Jennifer Rust Murray
Represented By: James A Francis
Represented By: Lauren KW Brennan
Represented By: John Soumilas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?