Williams v Uttecht
Plaintiff: Larry Paul Williams
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Case Number: 2:2020cv01482
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Michelle L Peterson
Referring Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND ANSWER, #4 2254 PETITION by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. Documents served electronically to Jeffrey Uttecht on 12/3/2020. (ST)
November 13, 2020 ***Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (ST)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (with signature page pursuant to #3 Order) to Include Signature Page per 11/9/20 Order to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Larry Paul Williams (Maybrown, Todd) Modified on 12/3/2020 to update language re the petition. (ST)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DECLINING TO SERVE 2254 PETITION by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Larry Paul Williams. The signature page or verification shall be filed not later than twenty (20) days from the date on which this Order is signed and shall carry the same case number as the present petition.(SG)
November 9, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Signature page due by 11/30/2020, (SG)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 REDACTION to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Redacted Appendix A to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Larry Paul Williams (Maybrown, Todd)
October 9, 2020 Judge Benjamin H. Settle and Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (ST)
October 9, 2020 NOTICE TO FILER: re [1-1 ] Exhibit. Document(s) contain personal identifiers that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2 and Local Civil Rule 5.2. You are required to re-file a redacted version of your document using the event Redacted Document located in the Other Documents category. This event will allow you to link back to your original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (MET)
October 7, 2020 Filing 1 2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Receipt # AWAWDC-6649421), filed by Larry Paul Williams. (Attachments: SEALED #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C)(Maybrown, Todd) Modified on 10/8/2020 to add type of petition and remove duplicative description of attachments. (ST) Modified on 10/9/2020 (MET).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Paul Williams
Represented By: Todd Maybrown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Uttecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?