King et al v. Liquor and Cannabis Board of the State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Christopher King, Kingcast and John Novak
Defendant: Liquor and Cannabis Board of the State of Washington, ONDCP, Mr. Jay Inslee, Jane Rushford, Robert E Ferguson, Rick Garza and William P Barr
Case Number: 2:2020cv01494
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) to be issued), filed by John Novak, Christopher King. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A Defendant Admission, #2 Appendix B Ten Legislators' ltr.)(King, Christopher)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Plaintiff Christopher King has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (VE)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (Sent to plaintiff via US Mail) (RE)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Plaintiff Chistopher King, J.D. in Support of Injunctive Relief filed by Plaintiff Christopher King re #2 MOTION for Relief. (RE)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Injunctive Relief, filed by Plaintiff Christopher King. (RE)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Summons(es) not received to issue) (Receipt # SEA102183), filed by Christopher King and John Novak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Email Transmittal)(RE) Modified on 10/15/2020 to add additional plaintiff.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Liquor and Cannabis Board of the State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher King
Represented By: Christopher King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kingcast
Represented By: Christopher King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Novak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liquor and Cannabis Board of the State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONDCP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jay Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Rushford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?